This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 09/25/2021 at 16:47:40 (UTC).

Thomas G. Stelljes, et al Plaintiff vs. State National Insurance Company, Inc Defendant

Case Summary

On 09/22/2021 Thomas G Stelljes, Plaintiff filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against State National Insurance Company, Inc Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Bidwill, Martin J.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7723

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Bidwill, Martin J.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Stelljes, Thomas G.

Stelljes, Robin J.

Defendant

State National Insurance Company, Inc

 

Court Documents

Clerk's Certificate of Compliance W-2020-73CIV/2020-74-UFC

9/23/2021 - Clerk's Certificate of Compliance W-2020-73CIV/2020-74-UFC

Civil Cover Sheet

9/22/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint (eFiled)

9/22/2021 - Complaint (eFiled)

Request for Production

9/22/2021 - Request for Production

Request for Admissions

9/22/2021 - Request for Admissions

Notice of Service of Interrogs

9/22/2021 - Notice of Service of Interrogs

Notice of Video Deposition

9/22/2021 - Notice of Video Deposition

Notice of Video Deposition

9/22/2021 - Notice of Video Deposition

Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses

9/22/2021 - Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses

eSummons Issuance

9/22/2021 - eSummons Issuance

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Compliance W-2020-73CIV/2020-74-UFC; NONE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketPer AOSC20-23 Amd12, Case is determined General

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet; Amount: $100,001.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint (eFiled); PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT FOR BREACH OF CONTRACT & DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; Party: Plaintiff Stelljes, Thomas G.; Party: Plaintiff Stelljes, Robin J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Production; Party: Plaintiff Stelljes, Thomas G.; Party: Plaintiff Stelljes, Robin J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions; Party: Plaintiff Stelljes, Thomas G.; Party: Plaintiff Stelljes, Robin J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogs; Party: Plaintiff Stelljes, Thomas G.; Party: Plaintiff Stelljes, Robin J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Video Deposition; Party: Plaintiff Stelljes, Thomas G.; Party: Plaintiff Stelljes, Robin J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Video Deposition; Party: Plaintiff Stelljes, Thomas G.; Party: Plaintiff Stelljes, Robin J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses; FirstPartyEService@kpattorney.com; Party: Plaintiff Stelljes, Thomas G.; Party: Plaintiff Stelljes, Robin J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; Party: Defendant State National Insurance Company, Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY INC. is a litigant