This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 06/09/2020 at 22:07:59 (UTC).

The Kidwell Group LLC Plaintiff vs. National Specialty Insurance Company Defendant

Case Summary

On 06/04/2019 The Kidwell Group LLC Plaintiff filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against National Specialty Insurance Company Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Cohen, Mardi Levey. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4691

  • Filing Date:

    06/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    Broward County Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Cohen, Mardi Levey

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

The Kidwell Group LLC

Pompano Beach Club North Assoc

Air Quality Assessors OF Florida

Defendant

National Specialty Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gonzalez, Robert Francis, ESQ.

Attorney at The Florida Insurance Law Group, LLC

8724 Sw 72Nd St # 260

Miami, FL 33173

Defendant Attorney

Herrera, Daniel M

Attorney at COLE SCOTT & KISSANE PA

110 Tower, 110 Se 6Th, Suite 2700

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301-5060

 

Court Documents

Notice of Cancellation

4/24/2020 - Notice of Cancellation

Order Granting

3/30/2020 - Order Granting

Notice of Cancellation

3/23/2020 - Notice of Cancellation

Re-Notice of Hearing

3/23/2020 - Re-Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing

3/11/2020 - Notice of Hearing

Response to Motion

3/5/2020 - Response to Motion

Notice of Hearing

2/11/2020 - Notice of Hearing

Order

1/16/2020 - Order

Motion for Default Final Judgment

1/15/2020 - Motion for Default Final Judgment

Motion for Default & Default

10/30/2019 - Motion for Default & Default

Notice of Service

10/30/2019 - Notice of Service

Complaint (eFiled)

6/4/2019 - Complaint (eFiled)

Civil Cover Sheet

6/4/2019 - Civil Cover Sheet

Notice of Service of Interrogs

6/4/2019 - Notice of Service of Interrogs

Request for Production

6/4/2019 - Request for Production

Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses

6/4/2019 - Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses

Notice of Voluntary Dismissal

4/23/2020 - Notice of Voluntary Dismissal

Default Final Judgment

1/22/2020 - Default Final Judgment

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Cancellation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionNotice of Voluntary Dismissal; Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; 1 Pages; Instrument Number: 116474240

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Dismiss; ACTION WITH PREJUDICE; Party: Defendant National Specialty Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Granting; PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO SET ASIDE FINAL DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing Affidavit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Cancellation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRe-Notice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRe-Notice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service; 6/14/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAdministrative Order; ORDER OF IMPENDING DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid; Payor: ALEXIS GONZALEZ ESQ ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20191FA1A078498; Amount: $300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: ALEXIS GONZALEZ ESQ ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20191FA1A078498; Amount: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint (eFiled)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Production

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Pompano Beach Club North Ass'n, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where NATIONAL SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where The Kidwell Group LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Air Quality Assessors of Florida is a litigant