This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 09/28/2020 at 14:01:46 (UTC).

Telecia Coward Plaintiff vs. Plantation General Hospital, et al Defendant

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Telecia Coward Plaintiff filed an Other lawsuit against Plantation General Hospital, Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Levenson, Jeffrey R.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5720

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Broward County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Broward County Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Levenson, Jeffrey R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Coward, Telecia

Defendants

Aventura Hospital and Medical Center

Plantation General Hospital

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gerson, Philip

2000 S Dixie Hwy

Miami, FL 33133-0000

 

Court Documents

Search for prior case performed per 2020-4-Civ-UFC-CO

9/24/2020 - Search for prior case performed per 2020-4-Civ-UFC-CO

Civil Cover Sheet

9/23/2020 - Civil Cover Sheet

Petition (eFiled)

9/23/2020 - Petition (eFiled)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSearch for prior case performed per 2020-4-Civ-UFC-CO; none

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DispositionDisposed by Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet; Amount: $100,001.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition (eFiled); FOR AUTOMATIC EXTENSION OF STATUE OF LIMITATIONS

    Read MoreRead Less