This case was last updated from Broward County Courts on 02/26/2020 at 20:56:38 (UTC).

TD Bank USA NA Plaintiff vs. Joseph A Madonia Defendant

Case Summary

On 02/22/2019 TD Bank USA NA Plaintiff filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Joseph A Madonia Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Courts, West Regional Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Francois, Phoebee. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3315

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Broward County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Regional Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Francois, Phoebee

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TD Bank USA NA

Defendant

Madonia, Joseph A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lavrar, Flynn

Attorney at RAS LaVrar LLC

Po Box 19039

Plantation, FL 33317

 

Court Documents

Motion for Default Final Judgment

9/30/2019 - Motion for Default Final Judgment

Certificate

9/30/2019 - Certificate

Non-Military Affidavit

9/30/2019 - Non-Military Affidavit

Notice of Filing

9/30/2019 - Notice of Filing

Disposition Order on Pretrial Conference

3/28/2019 - Disposition Order on Pretrial Conference

Summons Returned Served

3/8/2019 - Summons Returned Served

Statement of Claim (eFiled)

2/22/2019 - Statement of Claim (eFiled)

Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

2/22/2019 - Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

Notice

2/22/2019 - Notice

eSummons Issuance - Pretrial

2/22/2019 - eSummons Issuance - Pretrial

Default Final Judgment

10/4/2019 - Default Final Judgment

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/05/2019
  • DocketCertified Copy Fee; Payor: RAS LAVRAR ; Userid: CTS-acastillo ; Receipt: 20193YF3F000117; Amount: $3.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • DocketCertified Copy Issued; TO RECORDING DIVISION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionDefault Final Judgment; Comment (In Favor Of Plaintiff ); Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; 1 Pages; Instrument Number: 116097677

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • DispositionDisposed by Judge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Default Final Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate; of taxable costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNon-Military Affidavit; Party: Defendant Madonia, Joseph A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing; Supporting Affidavit; Party: Plaintiff TD Bank USA NA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • HearingPretrial Hearing; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Judicial Officer(s): 81 Francois, Phoebee; Location: West Courtroom 260

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDisposition Order on Pretrial Conference; (A DEFAULT IS HEREBY ENTERED AGAINST THE DEFENDANT(S), AND THE PLAINTIFF SHALL SUBMIT A JGMT FOR PLAINTIFF)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Served; 3-5-19; Party: Defendant Madonia, Joseph A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid; Payor: FLYNN LAVRAR ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20191FA1A029339; Amount: $175.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: FLYNN LAVRAR ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20191FA1A029339; Amount: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim (eFiled)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice; OF DESIGNATION OF LEAD ATTORNEY; Party: Plaintiff TD Bank USA NA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance - Pretrial

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TD Bank, NA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LaVrar, Flynn, ESQ.