This case was last updated from Broward County Courts on 02/25/2020 at 18:20:45 (UTC).

TD Bank USA NA Plaintiff vs. Alma P Best-Johnson Defendant

Case Summary

On 01/18/2018 TD Bank USA NA Plaintiff filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Alma P Best-Johnson Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Courts, West Regional Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Feld, Ellen. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1136

  • Filing Date:

    01/18/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Feld, Ellen

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TD Bank USA NA

Defendant

Best-Johnson, Alma P

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lavrar, Flynn

Attorney at RAS LaVrar, LLC

1133 S University Dr Fl 2

Plantation, FL 33324-3303

 

Court Documents

Motion for Default Final Judgment

12/10/2018 - Motion for Default Final Judgment

Certificate

12/10/2018 - Certificate

Non-Military Affidavit

12/10/2018 - Non-Military Affidavit

Notice of Filing

12/10/2018 - Notice of Filing

Disposition Order on Pretrial Conference

10/23/2018 - Disposition Order on Pretrial Conference

Order Granting Motion

10/1/2018 - Order Granting Motion

Notice of Resetting Pretrial

10/1/2018 - Notice of Resetting Pretrial

Motion

9/25/2018 - Motion

Summons Returned Served

9/13/2018 - Summons Returned Served

Disposition Order on Pretrial Conference

9/11/2018 - Disposition Order on Pretrial Conference

Summons Returned Unserved/Unexecuted

7/30/2018 - Summons Returned Unserved/Unexecuted

eSummons Issuance - Alias Pretrial

7/24/2018 - eSummons Issuance - Alias Pretrial

Disposition Order on Pretrial Conference

3/7/2018 - Disposition Order on Pretrial Conference

eSummons Issuance - Pretrial

1/18/2018 - eSummons Issuance - Pretrial

Notice

1/18/2018 - Notice

Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

1/18/2018 - Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

Statement of Claim (eFiled)

1/18/2018 - Statement of Claim (eFiled)

Default Final Judgment

12/18/2018 - Default Final Judgment

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2019
  • DocketCertified Copy Fee; Payor: RAS LAVRAR LAW OFFICES ; Userid: CTS-cbrown ; Receipt: 20193YF3C000177; Amount: $3.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • DocketCert Copy Jgmt Issued; recording

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionDefault Final Judgment; Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; 1 Pages; Instrument Number: 115508178

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • DispositionDisposed by Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Default Final Judgment; Party: Plaintiff TD Bank USA NA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate; OF TAXABLE COSTS; Party: Plaintiff TD Bank USA NA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNon-Military Affidavit; Party: Defendant Best-Johnson, Alma P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing; SUPPORTING AFFIDAVIT; Party: Plaintiff TD Bank USA NA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • HearingPretrial Hearing; Hearing Time: 2:00 PM; Judicial Officer(s): 83 Feld, Ellen; Location: West Courtroom 240

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDisposition Order on Pretrial Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 07/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Unserved/Unexecuted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance - Alias Pretrial; Party: Defendant Best-Johnson, Alma P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDisposition Order on Pretrial Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2018
  • HearingPretrial Hearing; Hearing Time: 2:00 PM; Judicial Officer(s): 83 Feld, Ellen; Location: West Courtroom 240

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance - Pretrial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid; Payor: FLYNN LAVRAR ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A008526; Amount: $300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: FLYNN LAVRAR ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A008526; Amount: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice; OF DESIGNATION OF LEAD ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim (eFiled)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TD Bank, NA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LaVrar, Flynn, ESQ.