This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 09/28/2020 at 03:33:35 (UTC).

Tanisha Valere Plaintiff vs. Gerard Zebrowki Defendant

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Tanisha Valere Plaintiff filed an Other lawsuit against Gerard Zebrowki Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Haimes, David A.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5711

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Broward County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Broward County Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Haimes, David A.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Valere, Tanisha

Defendant

Zebrowki, Gerard

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Darfoor, Kweku

Attorney at Darfoor Law Firm, P.A.

333 Las Olas Way, Cu-4, Suite 430

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

 

Court Documents

Search for prior case performed per 2020-4-Civ-UFC-CO

9/24/2020 - Search for prior case performed per 2020-4-Civ-UFC-CO

Civil Cover Sheet

9/23/2020 - Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint (eFiled)

9/23/2020 - Complaint (eFiled)

Interrogatories & Notice of Service

9/23/2020 - Interrogatories & Notice of Service

Request for Admissions

9/23/2020 - Request for Admissions

eSummons Issuance

9/23/2020 - eSummons Issuance

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSearch for prior case performed per 2020-4-Civ-UFC-CO; none

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet; Amount: $100,001.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint (eFiled); Party: Plaintiff Valere, Tanisha

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInterrogatories & Notice of Service; Party: Plaintiff Valere, Tanisha

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions; Party: Plaintiff Valere, Tanisha

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; Party: Defendant Zebrowki, Gerard

    Read MoreRead Less