This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 07/06/2020 at 16:36:18 (UTC).

Suntrust Bank Plaintiff vs. GTN Properties LLC, et al Defendant

Case Summary

On 11/05/2019 Suntrust Bank Plaintiff filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against GTN Properties LLC, Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Phillips, Carol-Lisa. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3031

  • Filing Date:

    11/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Phillips, Carol-Lisa

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Suntrust Bank

Defendants

Gonzalez, Claudio

Gama Aviation Management Inc

Professional Flight Transport Inc

Everest Fuel Management LLC

Gama Aviation Engineering

Aircare International LTD

GTN Properties LLC

Martinez, Ignacio

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Fitzgerald, Edward M

200 S. Orange Ave., Suite 2600, P.O. Box 1526

Orlando, FL 32802-0000

Defendant Attorneys

Goldstein, Mark Blair

Attorney at Mark B. Goldstein, P.A

2700 N. Military Trail, Suite 130

Boca Raton, FL 33431-6394

Zorrilla, Juan Carlos

Attorney at Fowler White Burnett, P.A.

Brickell Arch, 14Th Floor, 1395 Brickell Avenue

Miami, FL 33131

 

Court Documents

Notice of Cancellation

2/10/2020 - Notice of Cancellation

Suggestion of Bankruptcy

2/10/2020 - Suggestion of Bankruptcy

Notice of Filing

2/7/2020 - Notice of Filing

Response to Request to Produce

2/6/2020 - Response to Request to Produce

Acceptance of Service

2/5/2020 - Acceptance of Service

Motion to Strike Affirmative Defenses

2/5/2020 - Motion to Strike Affirmative Defenses

Response to Request for Admissions

2/5/2020 - Response to Request for Admissions

eSummons Issuance

11/6/2019 - eSummons Issuance

eSummons Issuance

11/6/2019 - eSummons Issuance

eSummons Issuance

11/6/2019 - eSummons Issuance

eSummons Issuance

11/6/2019 - eSummons Issuance

eSummons Issuance

11/6/2019 - eSummons Issuance

eSummons Issuance

11/6/2019 - eSummons Issuance

eSummons Issuance

11/6/2019 - eSummons Issuance

eSummons Not Issued - Atty advised

11/6/2019 - eSummons Not Issued - Atty advised

Civil Cover Sheet

11/5/2019 - Civil Cover Sheet

Final Order

3/3/2020 - Final Order

Notice of Dropping Party(S)

2/7/2020 - Notice of Dropping Party(S)

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionFinal Order; Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; 1 Pages; Instrument Number: 116395438

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DispositionDisposed by Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Cancellation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSuggestion of Bankruptcy; Case Number 20-11743-SMG; Party: Defendant GTN Properties LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionNotice of Dropping Party(S); Comment (Gama Aviation (Management), Inc. ); Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; 2 Pages; Instrument Number: 116338686

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAcceptance of Service; AND WAIVER ON DEFENDANT; Party: Defendant Gonzalez, Claudio

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Strike Affirmative Defenses; PLAINTIFF SUNTRUST BANK'S; Party: Plaintiff Suntrust Bank

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request for Admissions; PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT GAMA AVIATION (ENGINEERING), INC.'S FIRS; Party: Plaintiff Suntrust Bank

    Read MoreRead Less
34 More Docket Entries
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint (eFiled); Party: Plaintiff Suntrust Bank

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; Party: Defendant GTN Properties LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; Party: Defendant Everest Fuel Management LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; Party: Defendant Professional Flight Transport Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; Party: Defendant Gama Aviation Engineering

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; Party: Defendant Gama Aviation Management Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; Party: Defendant Aircare International LTD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; Party: Defendant Gonzalez, Claudio

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Not Issued - Atty advised; DEFENDANT NAME DOES NOT MATCH COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GAMA AVIATION ENGINEERING, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where SUNTRUST BANKS INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JUAN ZORRILLA

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GOLDSTEIN , MARK B