This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 05/10/2023 at 22:29:53 (UTC).

Sunset Falls Homeowners Association, Inc. Plaintiff vs. Jessie M Zenny Defendant

Case Summary

On 04/12/2022 Sunset Falls Homeowners Association, Inc Plaintiff filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Jessie M Zenny Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Robinson, Michael A.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5457

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Robinson, Michael A.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sunset Falls Homeowners Association, Inc.

Defendants

Zenny, Jessie M

Green Corridor Property Assessment Clean Energy (Pace) District

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Piccin, Raymond Anthony

 

Court Documents

eSummons Issuance

4/12/2022 - eSummons Issuance

eSummons Issuance

4/12/2022 - eSummons Issuance

eSummons Issuance

4/12/2022 - eSummons Issuance

Complaint (eFiled)

4/12/2022 - Complaint (eFiled)

Notice of Lis Pendens

4/12/2022 - Notice of Lis Pendens

Civil Cover Sheet

4/12/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet

Clerk's Certificate of Compliance W-2020-73CIV/2020-74-UFC

4/18/2022 - Clerk's Certificate of Compliance W-2020-73CIV/2020-74-UFC

Notice of Dropping Party(S)

5/5/2022 - Notice of Dropping Party(S)

Stipulation & Final Order of Dismissal

11/20/2022 - Stipulation & Final Order of Dismissal

Summons Returned Served

4/26/2022 - Summons Returned Served

Summons Returned Unserved

4/26/2022 - Summons Returned Unserved

Summons Returned Served

5/17/2022 - Summons Returned Served

Stipulation for-of Settlement

5/31/2022 - Stipulation for-of Settlement

Order Setting Case Management Conference

11/18/2022 - Order Setting Case Management Conference

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

11/20/2022
View Court Documents

DispositionDisposition(s): Stipulation & Final Order of Dismissal; Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; Pages: 2; Instrument Number: 118532364

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/20/2022

DispositionDisposed by Judge

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/18/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Order Setting Case Management Conference; Additional Text; 01-19-2023 8: 30 AM in courtroom 14150 or Zoom

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/31/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Stipulation for-of Settlement

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/17/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Summons Returned Served; Additional Text; 22nd day of April, 2022 / YGRENE ENERGY FUND FLORIDA LLC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/05/2022
View Court Documents

DispositionDisposition(s): Notice of Dropping Party(S); Comment (YGRENE ENERGY FUND FLORIDA LLC DBA GREEN CORRIDOR PROPERTY ASSESSMENT CLEAN ENERGY (PACE) DISTRICT ); Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; Pages: 1; Instrument Number: 118127807

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/26/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Summons Returned Unserved; Additional Text; UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JESSIE M. ZENNY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/26/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Summons Returned Served; Additional Text; 04/21/22; Party: Defendant Zenny, Jessie M

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/18/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Clerk's Certificate of Compliance W-2020-73CIV/2020-74-UFC; Additional Text; NONE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/12/2022

DocketDescription: Per AOSC20-23 Amd12, Case is determined Streamlined

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/12/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Civil Cover Sheet; Additional Text; Amount: $1.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/12/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Notice of Lis Pendens

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/12/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Complaint (eFiled)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/12/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: eSummons Issuance; Additional Text; JESSIE M. ZENNY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/12/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: eSummons Issuance; Additional Text; UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JESSIE M. ZENNY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/12/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: eSummons Issuance; Additional Text; YGRENE ENERGY FUND FLORIDA LLC DBA GREEN CORRIDOR PROPERTY ASSESSMENT CLEAN ENERGY (PACE) DISTRICT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less