This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 05/31/2023 at 02:44:38 (UTC).

Sunset Falls Homeowners Association, Inc., Plaintiff vs. Donald Ambroise Defendant

Case Summary

On 02/16/2021 Sunset Falls Homeowners Association, Inc , Plaintiff filed an Other lawsuit against Donald Ambroise Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Fahnestock, Fabienne E.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3275

  • Filing Date:

    02/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Fahnestock, Fabienne E.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sunset Falls Homeowners Association, Inc.,

Defendant

Ambroise, Donald

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Wilder, Leonard

Piccin, Raymond Anthony

 

Court Documents

Notice of Change of Address

1/19/2023 - Notice of Change of Address

Motion

11/28/2022 - Motion

Order Denying Motion to Vacate Judgment

10/26/2022 - Order Denying Motion to Vacate Judgment

Response

10/3/2022 - Response

Affidavit

9/13/2022 - Affidavit

Certificate of Service

9/12/2022 - Certificate of Service

Notice of Filing

9/12/2022 - Notice of Filing

Notice of Filing

9/12/2022 - Notice of Filing

Order Denying Motion

9/11/2022 - Order Denying Motion

Summons Returned Unserved

3/15/2021 - Summons Returned Unserved

Motion

3/10/2021 - Motion

Summons Returned Served

2/23/2021 - Summons Returned Served

Search for prior case performed per 2020-4-Civ-UFC-CO

2/17/2021 - Search for prior case performed per 2020-4-Civ-UFC-CO

Notice of Dropping Party(S)

3/11/2021 - Notice of Dropping Party(S)

Civil Cover Sheet

2/16/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint (eFiled)

2/16/2021 - Complaint (eFiled)

eSummons Issuance

2/16/2021 - eSummons Issuance

eSummons Issuance

2/16/2021 - eSummons Issuance

45 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice of Change of Address; Additional Text; Party: Plaintiff Sunset Falls Homeowners Association, Inc.,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Motion; Additional Text; DEFENDANT'S MOTION OPPOSING FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF INJUNCTION & DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Order Denying Motion to Vacate Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Response; Additional Text; TO PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF FILING CASELAW; Party: Defendant Ambroise, Donald

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Affidavit; Additional Text; Party: Defendant Ambroise, Donald

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Certificate of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice of Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice of Filing; Additional Text; EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT FOR MOTION TO VACATE FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT; Party: Defendant Ambroise, Donald

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Order Denying Motion; Additional Text; EX-PARTE MOTION FOR SEPTEMBER 12. 2022 SPECIAL SET HEARING BE CONDUCTED IN PERSON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Amended Motion; Additional Text; FOR SEPTEMBER 12, 2022 SPECIAL SET HEARING BE HELD IN PERSON; Party: Plaintiff Sunset Falls Homeowners Association, Inc.,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
38 More Docket Entries
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Order Denying Motion to Dismiss

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons Returned Unserved; Additional Text; ARLIOMEY AMBROISE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionDisposition(s): Notice of Dropping Party(S); Comment (ARLIOMEY AMBROISE ); Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; Pages: 1; Instrument Number: 117121159

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Motion; Additional Text; Party: Defendant Ambroise, Donald

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons Returned Served; Additional Text; 19th day of February, 2021; Party: Defendant Ambroise, Donald

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Search for prior case performed per 2020-4-Civ-UFC-CO; Additional Text; none

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (eFiled); Additional Text; FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF; Party: Plaintiff Sunset Falls Homeowners Association, Inc.,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: eSummons Issuance; Additional Text; Party: Defendant Ambroise, Donald

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: eSummons Issuance; Additional Text; Party: Defendant Ambroise, Arliomey

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less