This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 05/19/2023 at 18:42:38 (UTC).

SUNBELT RENTALS, INC. Plaintiff vs. MATRIX CONSTRUCTION BUILDERS, INC Defendant

Case Summary

On 07/22/2022 SUNBELT RENTALS, INC Plaintiff filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MATRIX CONSTRUCTION BUILDERS, INC Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Robinson, Michael A.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0741

  • Filing Date:

    07/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Robinson, Michael A.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SUNBELT RENTALS, INC.

Defendant

MATRIX CONSTRUCTION BUILDERS, INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ceriale, Matthew Agojo

Defendant Attorney

Lee, Eric, ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Complaint (eFiled)

7/22/2022 - Complaint (eFiled)

Civil Cover Sheet

7/22/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet

Clerk's Certificate of Compliance W-2020-73CIV/2020-74-UFC

7/22/2022 - Clerk's Certificate of Compliance W-2020-73CIV/2020-74-UFC

eSummons Issuance

7/22/2022 - eSummons Issuance

Notice of Appearance

8/3/2022 - Notice of Appearance

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

8/16/2022 - Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Notice of Unavailability

11/17/2022 - Notice of Unavailability

Order Setting Case Management Conference

12/15/2022 - Order Setting Case Management Conference

Notice of Unavailability

2/9/2023 - Notice of Unavailability

Uniform Order Setting Pretrial Deadline

2/24/2023 - Uniform Order Setting Pretrial Deadline

Interrogatories

3/7/2023 - Interrogatories

Response to Request for Admissions

4/20/2023 - Response to Request for Admissions

Notice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories

4/20/2023 - Notice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories

Response to Request for Production

4/20/2023 - Response to Request for Production

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

5/2/2023 - Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Response to Request for Production

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Response to Request for Admissions

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Interrogatories

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Uniform Order Setting Pretrial Deadline; Additional Text; CALENDAR CALL: 01-04-2024 at 10

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice of Unavailability

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Order Setting Case Management Conference; Additional Text; 02-24-2023 8: 30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice of Unavailability

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Answer & Affirmative Defenses; Additional Text; TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; Party: Defendant MATRIX CONSTRUCTION BUILDERS, INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice of Appearance; Additional Text; Party: Defendant MATRIX CONSTRUCTION BUILDERS, INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Per AOSC20-23 Amd12, Case is determined General

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Cover Sheet; Additional Text; Amount: $30,001.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (eFiled)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: eSummons Issuance; Additional Text; Party: Defendant MATRIX CONSTRUCTION BUILDERS, INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Clerk's Certificate of Compliance W-2020-73CIV/2020-74-UFC; Additional Text; None

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less