This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 05/19/2023 at 11:22:03 (UTC).

STORMFIELD CAPITAL FINDING I LLC Plaintiff vs. LEXDEN MANAGEMENT LLC, et al Defendant

Case Summary

On 07/13/2022 STORMFIELD CAPITAL FINDING I LLC Plaintiff filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against LEXDEN MANAGEMENT LLC, Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Bowman, John B.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0192

  • Filing Date:

    07/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Bowman, John B.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STORMFIELD CAPITAL FINDING I LLC

Defendants

LEXDEN MANAGEMENT LLC

Ali, Mark

Harford, Liz

Harford, Roger

SUNSET FALLS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Dixon, Audrey

Defendant Attorneys

Botsford, Bruce C

Strock, Barton Sheldon

 

Court Documents

Notice of Hearing

5/16/2023 - Notice of Hearing

Order for Substitution of Counsel

5/5/2023 - Order for Substitution of Counsel

Consent to Substitution of Counsel

5/5/2023 - Consent to Substitution of Counsel

Order Granting Motion to Withdraw

5/2/2023 - Order Granting Motion to Withdraw

Motion to Withdraw

5/2/2023 - Motion to Withdraw

Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel

5/2/2023 - Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel

Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel

5/2/2023 - Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel

Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel

4/28/2023 - Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel

Agreed Order

4/21/2023 - Agreed Order

Summons Returned Unserved/Unexecuted

7/13/2022 - Summons Returned Unserved/Unexecuted

Summons Returned Unserved/Unexecuted

7/13/2022 - Summons Returned Unserved/Unexecuted

Summons Returned Unserved/Unexecuted

7/13/2022 - Summons Returned Unserved/Unexecuted

Summons Returned Unserved/Unexecuted

7/13/2022 - Summons Returned Unserved/Unexecuted

Summons Returned Unserved/Unexecuted

7/13/2022 - Summons Returned Unserved/Unexecuted

Summons Returned Unserved/Unexecuted

7/13/2022 - Summons Returned Unserved/Unexecuted

Summons Returned Unserved/Unexecuted

7/13/2022 - Summons Returned Unserved/Unexecuted

Summons Returned Unserved/Unexecuted

7/13/2022 - Summons Returned Unserved/Unexecuted

Summons Returned Unserved/Unexecuted

7/13/2022 - Summons Returned Unserved/Unexecuted

53 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice of Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Order for Substitution of Counsel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Consent to Substitution of Counsel; Additional Text; Party: Defendant Harford, Liz Defendant Harford, Roger

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Order Granting Motion to Withdraw

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Motion to Withdraw; Additional Text; Party: Defendant LEXDEN MANAGEMENT LLC Defendant Ali, Mark

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel; Additional Text; Barton S. Stroek, Esq. Florida Bar No. 256226

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel; Additional Text; Barton S. Strock, Esq. Florida Bar No. 256226

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel; Additional Text; Barton S. Strock, Esq. Florida Bar No. 256226; Party: Defendant Harford, Liz Defendant Harford, Roger

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Agreed Order; Additional Text; GRANTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice of Unavailability; Additional Text; April 24,2023, to May 28,2023; Party: Defendant LEXDEN MANAGEMENT LLC Defendant Ali, Mark Defendant Harford, Liz Defendant Harford, Roger Defendant SUNSET FALLS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
46 More Docket Entries
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Value Claim Form

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons Returned Unserved/Unexecuted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons Returned Unserved/Unexecuted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons Returned Unserved/Unexecuted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons Returned Unserved/Unexecuted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons Returned Unserved/Unexecuted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons Returned Unserved/Unexecuted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons Returned Unserved/Unexecuted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons Returned Unserved/Unexecuted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons Returned Unserved/Unexecuted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less