This case was last updated from Broward County Courts on 03/15/2020 at 19:13:08 (UTC).

Steven Dobrofsky Plaintiff vs. Christopher McLaughlin DVM, et al Defendant

Case Summary

On 07/02/2018 Steven Dobrofsky Plaintiff filed an Other lawsuit against Christopher McLaughlin DVM, Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Courts, North Regional Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Hurley, John. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8000

  • Filing Date:

    07/02/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Hurley, John

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dobrofsky, Steven

Pompano Beach, FL 33062

Defendants

Lloyd S. Meisels, P.A.

Coral Springs Animal Hospital

Christopher McLaughlin DVM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Dobrofsky, Steven R, ESQ.

3208 Ne 10 St

Pompano Beach, FL 33062

Defendant Attorneys

Henry, Brian P

Attorney at Brian P. Henry, Esq Rolfes Henry CO., LPA

5577 Broadcast Court

Sarasota, FL 34240

Donner, Jessica

Attorney at Attn: Rolfes Henry CO, LPA

110 Se 6Th St, Ste 1440

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

 

Court Documents

Notice of Mediation

3/2/2020 - Notice of Mediation

Certificate of No Objection

2/18/2020 - Certificate of No Objection

Motion

1/30/2020 - Motion

Notice of Change of Address

11/6/2019 - Notice of Change of Address

Notice of Withdrawal

8/26/2019 - Notice of Withdrawal

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

8/26/2019 - Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Motion to Compel

6/25/2019 - Motion to Compel

Response

6/21/2019 - Response

Motion to Compel Discovery

6/11/2019 - Motion to Compel Discovery

Notice of Hearing

5/8/2019 - Notice of Hearing

Order Granting

5/7/2019 - Order Granting

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

1/22/2019 - Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Request for Production of Documents

11/5/2018 - Request for Production of Documents

Notice of Withdrawal

9/27/2018 - Notice of Withdrawal

Notice of Unavailability

9/12/2018 - Notice of Unavailability

Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses

8/7/2018 - Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses

Notice of Appearance

8/7/2018 - Notice of Appearance

Notice of Appearance

7/30/2018 - Notice of Appearance

70 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMediation Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Mediation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of No Objection

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder; On Df Motion For Jury trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Referring Case to Mediation

    Read MoreRead Less
66 More Docket Entries
  • 07/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance - Alias; Party: Defendant Christopher McLaughlin DVM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Unserved/Unexecuted; Party: Defendant Christopher McLaughlin DVM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Unserved/Unexecuted; 07/11/18; Party: Defendant Lloyd S. Meisels, P.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid; Payor: STEVEN DOBROFSKY ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A090564; Amount: $300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: STEVEN DOBROFSKY ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A090564; Amount: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: STEVEN DOBROFSKY ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A090564; Amount: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; Party: Defendant Christopher McLaughlin DVM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; Party: Defendant Lloyd S. Meisels, P.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint (eFiled)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Dobrofsky, Steven R, ESQ.