This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 10/10/2020 at 08:14:26 (UTC).

State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company Plaintiff vs. Duane J Cash, et al Defendant

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company Plaintiff filed an Other lawsuit against Duane J Cash, Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is McCarthy, Kathleen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5659

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Broward County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Broward County Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

McCarthy, Kathleen

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

Farr De Munroe, Lois Montenette

Defendants

Cash, Michael

Cash, Duane J

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Beckham, Eugene G, ESQ.

Attorney at Beckham & Beckham PA

2191 Ne 163Rd St Fl 2

North Miami Beach, FL 33162-4925

 

Court Documents

eSummons Issuance

10/6/2020 - eSummons Issuance

eSummons Issuance

10/6/2020 - eSummons Issuance

Civil Cover Sheet

9/23/2020 - Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint (eFiled)

9/23/2020 - Complaint (eFiled)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; Party: Defendant Cash, Duane J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; Party: Defendant Cash, Michael

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet; Amount: $8,001.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint (eFiled)

    Read MoreRead Less