This case was last updated from Broward County Courts on 02/15/2020 at 20:34:33 (UTC).

Stanger Health Care Centers Inc Plaintiff vs. USAA General Indemnity Company Defendant

Case Summary

On 02/08/2019 Stanger Health Care Centers Inc Plaintiff filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against USAA General Indemnity Company Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Courts, West Regional Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DePrimo, Natasha. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2797

  • Filing Date:

    02/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DePrimo, Natasha

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Stanger Health Care Centers Inc

Turken, Leonard

Defendant

USAA General Indemnity Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Leaser, Scott A

Attorney at LEASER LAW FIRM

P O Box 17107

Plantation, FL 33318

Defendant Attorney

Burton, Staci, ESQ.

1255 South Military Trail Suite 100

Deerfield Bch, FL 33442

 

Court Documents

Notice of Service of Interrogs

4/26/2019 - Notice of Service of Interrogs

Request for Admissions

4/26/2019 - Request for Admissions

Request to Produce

4/26/2019 - Request to Produce

Motion for Extension of Time

4/5/2019 - Motion for Extension of Time

Disposition Order on Pretrial Conference

3/18/2019 - Disposition Order on Pretrial Conference

Motion to Invoke Rules of Civil Procedure

3/18/2019 - Motion to Invoke Rules of Civil Procedure

Demand for Jury Trial

3/18/2019 - Demand for Jury Trial

Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses

3/18/2019 - Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses

Notice of Appearance

3/18/2019 - Notice of Appearance

Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

3/18/2019 - Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

Notice of Service on Insurance Comm-Returned Served

3/15/2019 - Notice of Service on Insurance Comm-Returned Served

Statement of Claim (eFiled)

2/8/2019 - Statement of Claim (eFiled)

Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses

2/8/2019 - Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses

eSummons Issuance - Pretrial

2/8/2019 - eSummons Issuance - Pretrial

Notice of Voluntary Dismissal W/Prejudice

6/12/2019 - Notice of Voluntary Dismissal W/Prejudice

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/13/2019
  • DispositionDismissed, Settled or Disposed After Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionNotice of Voluntary Dismissal W/Prejudice; Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; 1 Pages; Instrument Number: 115867113

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Extension of Time; Party: Defendant USAA General Indemnity Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • HearingPIP Pre-trial Hearing; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Judicial Officer(s): 82 DePrimo, Natasha; Location: West Courtroom 260

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDisposition Order on Pretrial Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Invoke Rules of Civil Procedure; Party: Defendant USAA General Indemnity Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Party: Defendant USAA General Indemnity Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses; Party: Defendant USAA General Indemnity Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Appearance; Party: Defendant USAA General Indemnity Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service on Insurance Comm-Returned Served; 2-19-19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid; Payor: SCOTT A LEASER PA ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20191FA1A023979; Amount: $80.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: SCOTT A LEASER PA ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20191FA1A023979; Amount: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim (eFiled)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses; Party: Plaintiff Stanger Health Care Centers Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance - Pretrial

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Stanger Health Care Centers Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where USAA GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Staci Burton