This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 11/11/2021 at 16:14:47 (UTC).

Sixt Car Sales, LLC Plaintiff vs. Eugene Lee, Jr., et al Defendant

Case Summary

On 11/05/2021 Sixt Car Sales, LLC Plaintiff filed a Property - Repossession lawsuit against Eugene Lee, Jr , Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Fahnestock, Fabienne E.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0104

  • Filing Date:

    11/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Repossession

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Fahnestock, Fabienne E.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sixt Car Sales, LLC

Defendants

Lee, Jr., Eugene

Advanced Auto Sales, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Zincone, Francesco A

Attorney at Armas Bertran Pieri

4960 S.W 72 Avenue, Suite 206

Miami, FL 33155

 

Court Documents

Complaint (eFiled)

11/5/2021 - Complaint (eFiled)

Civil Cover Sheet

11/5/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet

Clerk's Certificate of Compliance W-2020-73CIV/2020-74-UFC

11/8/2021 - Clerk's Certificate of Compliance W-2020-73CIV/2020-74-UFC

eSummons Issuance

11/8/2021 - eSummons Issuance

eSummons Issuance

11/8/2021 - eSummons Issuance

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; EUGENE LEE JR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; ADVANCED AUTO SALES, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Compliance W-2020-73CIV/2020-74-UFC; NONE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketPer AOSC20-23 Amd12, Case is determined Streamlined

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet; Amount: $75,001.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint (eFiled); Party: Plaintiff Sixt Car Sales, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer FRANCESCO ZINCONE