This case was last updated from Broward County Courts on 02/27/2020 at 01:00:10 (UTC).

Silver Hills Health & Rehab Clinic, Inc. Plaintiff vs. Geico Indemnity Company Defendant

Case Summary

On 02/20/2018 Silver Hills Health Rehab Clinic, Inc Plaintiff filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Geico Indemnity Company Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Courts, West Regional Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DePrimo, Natasha. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2217

  • Filing Date:

    02/20/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Broward County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Regional Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DePrimo, Natasha

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Silver Hills Health & Rehab Clinic, Inc.

Derosier, Michaele

Defendant

Geico Indemnity Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Daly, John C, Jr.

Attorney at Law Office of John C. Daly PA

8551 W. Sunrise Blvd., Ste#304

Plantation, FL 33322

Defendant Attorney

Abualown, Lubna

6700 North Andrews Avenue, Ste 404

Ft. Lauderdale, FL 33309

 

Court Documents

Response to Request to Produce

6/4/2018 - Response to Request to Produce

Response to Request for Admissions

6/4/2018 - Response to Request for Admissions

Ex Parte Order to Compel

5/24/2018 - Ex Parte Order to Compel

Motion to Compel Discovery

5/7/2018 - Motion to Compel Discovery

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

4/20/2018 - Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Request for Production

4/4/2018 - Request for Production

Request for Admissions

4/4/2018 - Request for Admissions

Notice of Service of Interrogs

4/4/2018 - Notice of Service of Interrogs

Notice of Taking Deposition

4/4/2018 - Notice of Taking Deposition

Notice of Filing

4/4/2018 - Notice of Filing

Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

4/2/2018 - Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

Statement of Claim (eFiled)

2/20/2018 - Statement of Claim (eFiled)

eSummons Issuance - Pretrial

2/20/2018 - eSummons Issuance - Pretrial

Notice of Voluntary Dismissal W/Prejudice

8/10/2018 - Notice of Voluntary Dismissal W/Prejudice

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionNotice of Voluntary Dismissal W/Prejudice; Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; 1 Pages; Instrument Number: 115256303

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • DispositionDismissed, Settled or Disposed Before Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEx Parte Order to Compel; DISCOVERY RESPONSES/GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Compel Discovery; RESPONSES; Party: Plaintiff Silver Hills Health & Rehab Clinic, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer & Affirmative Defenses; Party: Defendant Geico Indemnity Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Production

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Taking Deposition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • HearingPIP Pre-trial Hearing; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Judicial Officer(s): 82 DePrimo, Natasha; Location: West Courtroom 260; CANCELED: Cancelled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim (eFiled)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance - Pretrial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid; Payor: JOHN C DALY JR ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A026324; Amount: $55.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: JOHN C DALY JR ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A026324; Amount: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less