This case was last updated from Broward County Courts on 02/26/2020 at 15:36:48 (UTC).

SIDNEY FRAITAG, et al Plaintiff vs. HARTFORD INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE MIDWEST Defendant

Case Summary

On 02/12/2019 SIDNEY FRAITAG, Plaintiff filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against HARTFORD INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE MIDWEST Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Courts, North Regional Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Hurley, John. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3170

  • Filing Date:

    02/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Broward County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North Regional Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Hurley, John

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

FRAITAG, LENORE

FRAITAG, SIDNEY

Defendant

HARTFORD INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE MIDWEST

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Singh, Pritpal

Attorney at Kanner & Pintaluga PA

925 S Federal Hwy

Boca Raton, FL 33432

Defendant Attorney

Packer, Michael Adam

Attorney at Marshall, Dennehey, Warner, Coleman & Goggin, P.C.

100 Ne 3Rd Ave., Suite 1100

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301-1176

 

Court Documents

Notice of Appearance

8/7/2019 - Notice of Appearance

Motion

8/2/2019 - Motion

Agreed Order

6/13/2019 - Agreed Order

Notice of Cancellation

6/11/2019 - Notice of Cancellation

Notice of Hearing

5/10/2019 - Notice of Hearing

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

5/2/2019 - Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Motion for Extension of Time

5/2/2019 - Motion for Extension of Time

Motion to Compel

4/23/2019 - Motion to Compel

Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

4/2/2019 - Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

Disposition Order on Pretrial Conference

3/21/2019 - Disposition Order on Pretrial Conference

Notice of Appearance

3/7/2019 - Notice of Appearance

Notice of Filing

2/27/2019 - Notice of Filing

Statement of Claim (eFiled)

2/12/2019 - Statement of Claim (eFiled)

Request to Produce

2/12/2019 - Request to Produce

Request for Admissions

2/12/2019 - Request for Admissions

Interrogatories

2/12/2019 - Interrogatories

Notice of Taking Deposition

2/12/2019 - Notice of Taking Deposition

eSummons Issuance - Pretrial

2/12/2019 - eSummons Issuance - Pretrial

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Appearance; AMENDED; Party: Defendant HARTFORD INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE MIDWEST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion; TO DEEM DEFENDANT'S RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR ADMISSIONS ADMITTED; Party: Plaintiff FRAITAG, SIDNEY; Party: Plaintiff FRAITAG, LENORE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAgreed Order; ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Cancellation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAgreed Order; GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS' DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer & Affirmative Defenses; Party: Defendant HARTFORD INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE MIDWEST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Extension of Time; to respond to pl's discovery; Party: Defendant HARTFORD INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE MIDWEST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Compel; Party: Plaintiff FRAITAG, LENORE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 02/13/2019
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid; Payor: MAX M. MESSINGER ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20191FA1A024289; Amount: $300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: MAX M. MESSINGER ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20191FA1A024289; Amount: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim (eFiled)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce; Party: Plaintiff FRAITAG, SIDNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions; Party: Plaintiff FRAITAG, SIDNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInterrogatories; Party: Plaintiff FRAITAG, SIDNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Taking Deposition; Party: Plaintiff FRAITAG, SIDNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Taking Deposition; Party: Plaintiff FRAITAG, SIDNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses; Party: Plaintiff FRAITAG, SIDNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance - Pretrial

    Read MoreRead Less