This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 05/05/2020 at 14:09:47 (UTC).

Shannon M Rose Plaintiff vs. American Coastal Realty & Yacht Sales, Inc, et al Defendant

Case Summary

On 03/24/2020 Shannon M Rose Plaintiff filed an Other lawsuit against American Coastal Realty Yacht Sales, Inc, Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Bowman, John B.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5237

  • Filing Date:

    03/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Broward County Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Bowman, John B.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rose, Shannon M

Defendants

Camelot Property Management, Llc

Camelot Property Management & Real Estate Services

Bonnie Properties, Llc

Concord Property Management, Llc

American Coastal Realty & Yacht Sales, Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

McFarlane, William J

210 N University Dr, Fl 6Th

Coral Springs, FL 33071

Defendant Attorney

Trybus, Bruce Michael

Attorney at Cooney Trybus Kwavnick Peets

1600 W. Commercial Blvd., Ste. 200

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33309

 

Court Documents

Notice of Taking Deposition

4/30/2020 - Notice of Taking Deposition

Reply to Affirmative Defenses

4/22/2020 - Reply to Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

4/20/2020 - Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Notice of Interrogatories

4/20/2020 - Notice of Interrogatories

Request to Produce

4/20/2020 - Request to Produce

Notice of Taking Deposition

4/20/2020 - Notice of Taking Deposition

Request for Admissions

4/15/2020 - Request for Admissions

Notice of Service of Interrogs

4/15/2020 - Notice of Service of Interrogs

Request for Production

4/15/2020 - Request for Production

Notice of Service of Interrogs

4/15/2020 - Notice of Service of Interrogs

Civil Cover Sheet

3/24/2020 - Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint (eFiled)

3/24/2020 - Complaint (eFiled)

eSummons Issuance

3/24/2020 - eSummons Issuance

eSummons Issuance

3/24/2020 - eSummons Issuance

eSummons Issuance

3/24/2020 - eSummons Issuance

eSummons Issuance

3/24/2020 - eSummons Issuance

eSummons Issuance

3/24/2020 - eSummons Issuance

Notice of Compliance

3/24/2020 - Notice of Compliance

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Taking Deposition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReply to Affirmative Defenses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer & Affirmative Defenses; BONNIE PROPERTIES, LLC, and AMERICAN COASTAL REALTY & YACHT SALES, INC., a

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Interrogatories; PROPOUNDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Taking Deposition; William J. McFarlane, III, Esq./Christina Hawk, Esq,, McFarlane

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions; PLAINTIFF'S FIRST; Party: Plaintiff Rose, Shannon M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogs; ON DEFENDANT BONNIE PROPERTIES, LLC; Party: Plaintiff Rose, Shannon M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Production

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions; Party: Plaintiff Rose, Shannon M

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Production; DEFENDANT, AMERICAN COASTAL REALTY & YACHT SALES, INC; Party: Plaintiff Rose, Shannon M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogs; AMERICAN COASTAL REALTY & YACHT SALES, INC; Party: Plaintiff Rose, Shannon M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet; Amount: $30,000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint (eFiled); FOR DAMAGES; Party: Plaintiff Rose, Shannon M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; Party: Defendant American Coastal Realty & Yacht Sales, Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; Party: Defendant Bonnie Properties, Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; Party: Defendant Camelot Property Management, Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; Party: Defendant Camelot Property Management & Real Estate Services

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; Party: Defendant Concord Property Management, Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Compliance; pleadinqservice@.mcfarlanedolanlaw.com

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Camelot Property Management & Real Estate Services is a litigant

Latest cases where Bonnie Properties LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WILLIAM J MCFARLANE III, ESQ