This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 02/10/2020 at 13:05:38 (UTC).

SCG Atlas Deercreek LLC Plaintiff vs. Brian Ewald Defendant

Case Summary

On 01/21/2019 SCG Atlas Deercreek LLC Plaintiff filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against Brian Ewald Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Barner, Florence Taylor. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2331

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • Court:

    Broward County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Broward County Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Barner, Florence Taylor

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SCG Atlas Deercreek LLC

Defendant

Ewald, Brian

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lowenhaupt, Kenneth James, ESQ.

Attorney at Law Offices of Lowenhaupt Sawyers and Spinale

7765 Sw 87Th Avenue, Suite 201

Miami, FL 33173

 

Court Documents

Motion to Set Aside

4/2/2019 - Motion to Set Aside

Faxed Copy

3/12/2019 - Faxed Copy

Affidavit of Non-Compliance

3/7/2019 - Affidavit of Non-Compliance

Motion

3/7/2019 - Motion

Motion

2/20/2019 - Motion

Stipulation

2/20/2019 - Stipulation

Faxed Copy

2/11/2019 - Faxed Copy

Motion for Default & Default

2/4/2019 - Motion for Default & Default

Motion for Default Jgmt

2/4/2019 - Motion for Default Jgmt

Summons Served-Posted

1/29/2019 - Summons Served-Posted

Civil Cover Sheet

1/21/2019 - Civil Cover Sheet

eSummons Issuance

1/21/2019 - eSummons Issuance

Complaint (eFiled)

1/21/2019 - Complaint (eFiled)

Order Setting Aside Judgment

4/8/2019 - Order Setting Aside Judgment

Final Judgment for Eviction

3/15/2019 - Final Judgment for Eviction

Order Approving Settlement

2/27/2019 - Order Approving Settlement

Order Approving Settlement

2/20/2019 - Order Approving Settlement

Default Judgment for Eviction

2/12/2019 - Default Judgment for Eviction

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionOrder Setting Aside Judgment; Comment (AND ENTRY OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL ); Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; 1 Pages; Instrument Number: 115726290

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Set Aside; MOTION TO SET ASIDE AND VACATE THE JUDGMENT AND ENTRY OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Party: Plaintiff SCG Atlas Deercreek LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • DocketComment:; ***Writ of possession along with check returned back to atty office***

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionFinal Judgment for Eviction; Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; 1 Pages; Instrument Number: 115677974

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFaxed Copy; ***from atty office to return default package***

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Non-Compliance; Party: Plaintiff SCG Atlas Deercreek LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion; for Tenant Removal; Party: Plaintiff SCG Atlas Deercreek LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionOrder Approving Settlement; Comment (AND DISMISSAL AND SETTING ASIDE DEFAULT JUDGMENT ); Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; 1 Pages; Instrument Number: 115643448

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionOrder Approving Settlement; Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; 1 Pages; Instrument Number: 115626990

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion; FOR AN ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION AND DISMISSAL AND SETTING ASIDE DEFAULT JUDGMENT; Party: Plaintiff SCG Atlas Deercreek LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Default & Default; Party: Defendant Ewald, Brian

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Default Jgmt; FOR REMOVAL OF TENANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNon-Military Affidavit; AND AFFIDAVIT OF NON-PAYMENT OF RENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Served-Posted; 1/25/19 Service Time: 12:02 PM; Party: Defendant Ewald, Brian

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing; Party: Defendant Ewald, Brian

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid; Payor: KENNETH J LOWENHAUPT ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20191FA1A011477; Amount: $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: KENNETH J LOWENHAUPT ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20191FA1A011477; Amount: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint (eFiled)

    Read MoreRead Less