This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 05/27/2023 at 02:18:48 (UTC).

Samanta Gomez Plaintiff vs. Citizens Property Insurance Corporation Defendant

Case Summary

On 12/15/2022 Samanta Gomez Plaintiff filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Citizens Property Insurance Corporation Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Fahnestock, Fabienne E.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8357

  • Filing Date:

    12/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Fahnestock, Fabienne E.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Gomez, Samanta

Defendant

Citizens Property Insurance Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Low, David, ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

Palmer, Hunter Paul

 

Court Documents

Notice of Cancellation

5/26/2023 - Notice of Cancellation

Certificate of No Objection

5/12/2023 - Certificate of No Objection

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

5/8/2023 - Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Motion for Extension of Time

4/27/2023 - Motion for Extension of Time

Notice of Production From Non-Party

4/21/2023 - Notice of Production From Non-Party

Response to Request for Admissions

4/17/2023 - Response to Request for Admissions

Response to Request for Production

4/17/2023 - Response to Request for Production

Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement

4/11/2023 - Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement

Agreed Order Granting

3/14/2023 - Agreed Order Granting

Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses

12/29/2022 - Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses

Notice of Acceptance of Service of Process

12/22/2022 - Notice of Acceptance of Service of Process

eSummons Issuance

12/16/2022 - eSummons Issuance

Clerk's Certificate of Compliance W-2020-73CIV/2020-74-UFC

12/16/2022 - Clerk's Certificate of Compliance W-2020-73CIV/2020-74-UFC

Civil Cover Sheet

12/15/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint (eFiled)

12/15/2022 - Complaint (eFiled)

Request for Admissions

12/15/2022 - Request for Admissions

Request for Production

12/15/2022 - Request for Production

Notice of Service of Interrogs

12/15/2022 - Notice of Service of Interrogs

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice of Cancellation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Certificate of No Objection

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Motion for Extension of Time

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice of Production From Non-Party

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Response to Request for Admissions

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Response to Request for Production

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Agreed Order Granting; Additional Text; Motion for Extension of Time

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Re-Notice of Taking Deposition

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 12/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses; Additional Text; Party: Defendant Citizens Property Insurance Corporation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice of Acceptance of Service of Process; Additional Text; 12/20/2022; Party: Defendant Citizens Property Insurance Corporation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: eSummons Issuance; Additional Text; CITIZENS PROPERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Clerk's Certificate of Compliance W-2020-73CIV/2020-74-UFC; Additional Text; NONE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: Per AOSC20-23 Amd12, Case is determined General

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Cover Sheet; Additional Text; Amount: $30,001.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (eFiled); Additional Text; Party: Plaintiff Gomez, Samanta

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Request for Admissions; Additional Text; FIRST; Party: Plaintiff Gomez, Samanta

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Request for Production; Additional Text; FIRST; Party: Plaintiff Gomez, Samanta

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice of Service of Interrogs; Additional Text; FIRST SET; Party: Plaintiff Gomez, Samanta

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less