This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 01/31/2021 at 16:27:47 (UTC).

Sahira Santana Plaintiff vs. Varian Medical Systems, Inc.,, et al Defendant

Case Summary

On 01/21/2021 Sahira Santana Plaintiff filed an Other lawsuit against Varian Medical Systems, Inc ,, Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Perlman, Sandra. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1506

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Perlman, Sandra

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Santana, Sahira

Defendants

Carl Warren & Company

USAA Casualty Insurance

Marshall, Leigh Anne Mary

Marshall, David W.

Varian Medical Systems, Inc.,

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Dean, Clement R

150 S Pine Island Road, Suite 300

Plantation, FL 33324

 

Court Documents

Search for prior case performed per 2020-4-Civ-UFC-CO

1/22/2021 - Search for prior case performed per 2020-4-Civ-UFC-CO

Civil Cover Sheet

1/21/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint (eFiled)

1/21/2021 - Complaint (eFiled)

eSummons Issuance

1/21/2021 - eSummons Issuance

eSummons Issuance

1/21/2021 - eSummons Issuance

eSummons Issuance

1/21/2021 - eSummons Issuance

eSummons Issuance

1/21/2021 - eSummons Issuance

eSummons Issuance

1/21/2021 - eSummons Issuance

Request for Production

1/21/2021 - Request for Production

Request for Production

1/21/2021 - Request for Production

Request for Production

1/21/2021 - Request for Production

Request for Production

1/21/2021 - Request for Production

Request for Production

1/21/2021 - Request for Production

Interrogatories

1/21/2021 - Interrogatories

Interrogatories

1/21/2021 - Interrogatories

Interrogatories

1/21/2021 - Interrogatories

Interrogatories

1/21/2021 - Interrogatories

Interrogatories

1/21/2021 - Interrogatories

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSearch for prior case performed per 2020-4-Civ-UFC-CO; NONE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet; Amount: $100,001.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint (eFiled); Party: Plaintiff Santana, Sahira

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; Party: Defendant Varian Medical Systems, Inc.,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; Party: Defendant Carl Warren & Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; Party: Defendant Marshall, David W.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; Party: Defendant Marshall, Leigh Anne Mary

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; Party: Defendant USAA Casualty Insurance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Production; TO DEFENDANT VARIAN MEDICAL SYSTEMS, INC.; Party: Plaintiff Santana, Sahira

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Production; TO DEFENDANT CARL WARREN & COMPANY; Party: Plaintiff Santana, Sahira

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Production; TO DEFENDANT DAVID W. MARSHALL; Party: Plaintiff Santana, Sahira

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Production; TO DEFENDANT LEIGH ANNE MARY MARSHALL; Party: Plaintiff Santana, Sahira

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Production; TO DEFENDANT USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE; Party: Plaintiff Santana, Sahira

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInterrogatories; TO DEFENDANT VARIAN MEDICAL SYSTEMS, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInterrogatories; TO DEFENDANT, CARL WARREN & COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInterrogatories; TO DEFENDANT DAVID W. MARSHALL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInterrogatories; TO DEFENDANT LEIGH ANNE MARY MARSHALL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInterrogatories; TO DEFENDANT, USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Varian Medical Systems, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where CARL WARREN & COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where USAA Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Dean, Clement R, Jr.