This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 09/27/2020 at 14:38:06 (UTC).

Rosalie Allen Plaintiff vs. White Stone Foods, LLC Defendant

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Rosalie Allen Plaintiff filed an Other lawsuit against White Stone Foods, LLC Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Robinson, Michael A.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5665

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Broward County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Broward County Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Robinson, Michael A.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Allen, Rosalie

Defendant

White Stone Foods, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Tenenbaum, Jason

Attorney at Jason Tenenbaum

595 Stewart Ave, Suite 400

Garden City, NY 11530-4736

 

Court Documents

Search for prior case performed per 2020-4-Civ-UFC-CO

9/24/2020 - Search for prior case performed per 2020-4-Civ-UFC-CO

Civil Cover Sheet

9/23/2020 - Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint (eFiled)

9/23/2020 - Complaint (eFiled)

Notice of Propounding Interrogatories

9/23/2020 - Notice of Propounding Interrogatories

Request for Admissions

9/23/2020 - Request for Admissions

Request for Production

9/23/2020 - Request for Production

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketNo Summons Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSearch for prior case performed per 2020-4-Civ-UFC-CO; NONE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet; Amount: $30,001.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint (eFiled); COMPLAINT and DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; Party: Plaintiff Allen, Rosalie

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Propounding Interrogatories; Party: Plaintiff Allen, Rosalie

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions; Party: Plaintiff Allen, Rosalie

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Production; Party: Plaintiff Allen, Rosalie

    Read MoreRead Less