This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 02/03/2020 at 14:20:48 (UTC).

Ron DeSantis Plaintiff vs. Accredited Surety And Casualty Company Inc Defendant

Case Summary

On 01/22/2020 Ron DeSantis Plaintiff filed an Other lawsuit against Accredited Surety And Casualty Company Inc Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1170

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Broward County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Broward County Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DeSantis, Ron

Defendant

Accredited Surety And Casualty Company Inc

Not Classified By Court

F127540

Wright, April

Baranda Bail Bonds

Vickers, Baranda

 

Court Documents

Certified Copy of Order Estreating Bond

1/22/2020 - Certified Copy of Order Estreating Bond

Copy

1/22/2020 - Copy

Receipt

1/22/2020 - Receipt

Final Judgment Bond Estreature

1/30/2020 - Final Judgment Bond Estreature

Certificate of Satisfaction of Jgmt

1/30/2020 - Certificate of Satisfaction of Jgmt

Certificate of Satisfaction of Jgmt

1/22/2020 - Certificate of Satisfaction of Jgmt

Final Judgment Bond Estreature

1/22/2020 - Final Judgment Bond Estreature

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionFinal Judgment Bond Estreature; Comment (AMENDED ); Monetary Award/Costs - (Awarded To: DeSantis, Ron),(Awarded Against: Accredited Surety And Casualty Company Inc),(Principal:100.00) ,(Total Fees:100.00) ; Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; 1 Pages; Instrument Number: 116321151

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionCertificate of Satisfaction of Jgmt; Comment (AMENDED ); Monetary Award/Costs - (Awarded To: DeSantis, Ron),(Awarded Against: Accredited Surety And Casualty Company Inc),(Principal:100.00) ,(Total Fees:100.00) ; Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; 1 Pages; Instrument Number: 116321145

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionCertificate of Satisfaction of Jgmt; Monetary Award/Costs - (Awarded To: DeSantis, Ron),(Awarded Against: Accredited Surety And Casualty Company Inc),(Principal:100.00) ,(Total Fees:100.00) ; Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; 1 Pages; Instrument Number: 116305602

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionFinal Judgment Bond Estreature; Monetary Award/Costs - (Awarded To: DeSantis, Ron),(Awarded Against: Accredited Surety And Casualty Company Inc),(Principal:100.00) ,(Total Fees:100.00) ; Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; 1 Pages; Instrument Number: 116302960

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DispositionDisposed by Judge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketGive All Pleadings to Bond Estreature Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketNo Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketNo Summons Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketPower Number; BB-5838326

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertified Copy of Order Estreating Bond; 11/12/2019; Amount: $100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCopy; BOND ESTREATURE SATISFACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReceipt; Bond Estreature / TM

    Read MoreRead Less