This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 01/31/2021 at 17:42:58 (UTC).

Rokehsia Wimberly, et al Plaintiff vs. Northwest Medical Center et al. Defendant

Case Summary

On 01/25/2021 Rokehsia Wimberly, Plaintiff filed an Other lawsuit against Northwest Medical Center Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Robinson, Michael A.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1605

  • Filing Date:

    01/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Robinson, Michael A.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Wimberly, Rokehsia

Williams, Carlton

Defendant

Northwest Medical Center et al.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Spillis, Peter K

Attorney at Kelley Uustal, PLC

500 N. Federal Highway, Suite 200

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33316

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Compliance

12/6/2021 - Certificate of Compliance

Civil Cover Sheet

1/25/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet

Petition (eFiled)

1/25/2021 - Petition (eFiled)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Compliance; None

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketNo Summons Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition (eFiled); FOR AUTOMATIC EXTENSION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS PURSUANT TO SECTION 766.04 (2) FLORIDA STATUTES

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Northwest Medical Center, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Spillis, Peter K.