This case was last updated from Broward County Courts on 05/05/2020 at 00:01:38 (UTC).

Robert Tigar Plaintiff vs. Pompano Beach Club North Assc. Inc Defendant

Case Summary

On 06/10/2019 Robert Tigar Plaintiff filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Pompano Beach Club North Assc Inc Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Courts, North Regional Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DeLuca, Steven P.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7223

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    North Regional Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DeLuca, Steven P.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tigar, Robert

Defendant

Pompano Beach Club North Assc. Inc

 

Court Documents

Summons Returned Served

7/2/2019 - Summons Returned Served

Statement of Claim

6/10/2019 - Statement of Claim

Notice of Voluntary Dismissal

7/15/2019 - Notice of Voluntary Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/16/2019
  • HearingPretrial Hearing; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Judicial Officer(s): 73 DeLuca, Steven P.; Location: North Courtroom 2; CANCELED: Disposed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionNotice of Voluntary Dismissal; Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; 1 Pages; Instrument Number: 115928157

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • DispositionDismissed, Settled or Disposed Before Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Served; 06/20/19

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid; Payor: J M ASSOCIATES ; Userid: CTS-ebowman ; Receipt: 20192YF2B000286; Amount: $175.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: J M ASSOCIATES ; Userid: CTS-ebowman ; Receipt: 20192YF2B000286; Amount: $10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • DocketSummons Issued to Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Pompano Beach Club North Ass'n, Inc. is a litigant