This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 02/24/2020 at 17:26:48 (UTC).

Robert N Connors, et al Plaintiff vs. Ben Aim Jacques Raymond Defendant

Case Summary

On 01/24/2020 Robert N Connors, Plaintiff filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against Ben Aim Jacques Raymond Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Miranda, Giuseppina. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2000

  • Filing Date:

    01/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • Court:

    Broward County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Broward County Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Miranda, Giuseppina

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Connors, Robert N

Cohen, Yaniv

Defendant

Raymond, Ben Aim Jacques

 

Court Documents

Motion for Default & Default

2/7/2020 - Motion for Default & Default

Motion for Default Judgment of Eviction

2/7/2020 - Motion for Default Judgment of Eviction

Summons Returned Served

2/7/2020 - Summons Returned Served

Non-Military Affidavit

2/7/2020 - Non-Military Affidavit

Civil Cover Sheet

1/24/2020 - Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint

1/24/2020 - Complaint

Default Judgment for Eviction

2/13/2020 - Default Judgment for Eviction

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionDefault Judgment for Eviction; Comment ((2/12/2020) ); Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; 1 Pages; Instrument Number: 116349906

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DispositionDisposed by Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketWrit of Possession Issued to Plaintiff; (holdbox)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Default & Default; ---------------x; Party: Plaintiff Connors, Robert N; Party: Plaintiff Cohen, Yaniv

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Default Judgment of Eviction; --------------x; Party: Plaintiff Connors, Robert N; Party: Plaintiff Cohen, Yaniv

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Served; 1/25/20; Party: Defendant Raymond, Ben Aim Jacques

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNon-Military Affidavit; Party: Plaintiff Connors, Robert N; Party: Plaintiff Cohen, Yaniv

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued to Process Server

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing

    Read MoreRead Less