This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 09/28/2020 at 14:15:35 (UTC).

Robert J Kantor Plaintiff vs. Anacarolina M Barth, et al Defendant

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Robert J Kantor Plaintiff filed an Other lawsuit against Anacarolina M Barth, Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Frink, Keathan B.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5739

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Broward County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Broward County Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Frink, Keathan B.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kantor, Robert J

Defendants

Barth, Anacarolina M

Niebauer, Elisabete G

Progressive American Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Davis, Jeffrey Robert

Attorney at JEFFREY R. DAVIS, P.A

75 Valencia Avenue, Suite 100

Coral Gables,, FL 33134

 

Court Documents

Search for prior case performed per 2020-4-Civ-UFC-CO

9/24/2020 - Search for prior case performed per 2020-4-Civ-UFC-CO

Civil Cover Sheet

9/23/2020 - Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint (eFiled)

9/23/2020 - Complaint (eFiled)

Request for Admissions

9/23/2020 - Request for Admissions

Notice of Video Deposition

9/23/2020 - Notice of Video Deposition

Notice of Video Deposition

9/23/2020 - Notice of Video Deposition

eSummons Issuance

9/23/2020 - eSummons Issuance

eSummons Issuance

9/23/2020 - eSummons Issuance

eSummons Issuance

9/23/2020 - eSummons Issuance

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSearch for prior case performed per 2020-4-Civ-UFC-CO; NONE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet; Amount: $100,001.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint (eFiled); COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES; Party: Plaintiff Kantor, Robert J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions; TO DEFENDANT, ELISABETE G. NIEBAUER; Party: Plaintiff Kantor, Robert J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Video Deposition; FRIDAY, NOVEMBER 20, 2020 @ 10 A.M; Party: Plaintiff Kantor, Robert J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Video Deposition; FRIDAY, NOVEMBER 20, 2020 @ 10 A.M; Party: Plaintiff Kantor, Robert J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; Party: Defendant Barth, Anacarolina M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; Party: Defendant Niebauer, Elisabete G

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; Party: Defendant Progressive American Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less