This case was last updated from Broward County Courts on 02/26/2020 at 19:17:52 (UTC).

Richard A Henry DC PA Plaintiff vs. USAA Casualty Insurance Company Defendant

Case Summary

On 02/09/2018 Richard A Henry DC PA Plaintiff filed an Other lawsuit against USAA Casualty Insurance Company Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Courts, West Regional Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Feld, Ellen. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1897

  • Filing Date:

    02/09/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Broward County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Regional Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Feld, Ellen

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Richard A Henry DC PA

Lacy, Brittney

Defendant

USAA Casualty Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Morgan, Justin G

Attorney at Law Offices of Justin G. Morgan, P.A

2500 Weston Road, Suite 211

Weston, FL 33331

Guller, Susan, ESQ.

Attorney at Law Offices of Justin G. Morgan, P.A.

2500 Weston Rd., Suite 211

Weston, FL 33331

Defendant Attorney

Rampersad, Ananta

Attorney at Roig Lawyers

2054 Vista Parkway, Suite 400

West Palm Beach, FL 33411

 

Court Documents

Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement

5/23/2019 - Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement

Agreed Order

10/8/2018 - Agreed Order

Agreed Order

10/8/2018 - Agreed Order

Motion for Extension of Time

10/2/2018 - Motion for Extension of Time

Response to Request for Admissions

9/4/2018 - Response to Request for Admissions

Privilege Log

8/30/2018 - Privilege Log

Response to Request for Production

8/30/2018 - Response to Request for Production

Notice of Service of Interrogs

8/28/2018 - Notice of Service of Interrogs

Motion for Leave to Amend

7/13/2018 - Motion for Leave to Amend

Reply

5/11/2018 - Reply

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

4/16/2018 - Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Motion for Enlargement of Time

4/5/2018 - Motion for Enlargement of Time

Notice of Appearance

3/13/2018 - Notice of Appearance

Demand for Jury Trial

3/13/2018 - Demand for Jury Trial

Motion to Invoke Rules of Civil Procedure

3/13/2018 - Motion to Invoke Rules of Civil Procedure

eSummons Issuance

2/9/2018 - eSummons Issuance

Complaint (eFiled)

2/9/2018 - Complaint (eFiled)

Notice of Voluntary Dismissal W/Prejudice

5/21/2019 - Notice of Voluntary Dismissal W/Prejudice

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Serving Proposal for Settlement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionNotice of Voluntary Dismissal W/Prejudice; Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; 1 Pages; Instrument Number: 115819657

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • DispositionDismissed, Settled or Disposed Before Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Unavailability; Party: Plaintiff Richard A Henry DC PA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReply; TO AMENDED AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Party: Plaintiff Richard A Henry DC PA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories; Party: Defendant USAA Casualty Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAgreed Order; on Defendant's Motion for Leave to Amend Answer and Affirmative Defenses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAgreed Order; on Defendant's Motion to Permit Late Filing of Answers

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Extension of Time; REGARDING DISCOVERY; Party: Plaintiff Richard A Henry DC PA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request for Admissions; Party: Defendant USAA Casualty Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 03/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Appearance; Party: Defendant USAA Casualty Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses; Party: Defendant USAA Casualty Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Party: Defendant USAA Casualty Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Invoke Rules of Civil Procedure; Party: Defendant USAA Casualty Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Enlargement of Time; Party: Defendant USAA Casualty Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint (eFiled)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid; Payor: JUSTIN G MORGAN ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A020994; Amount: $300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: JUSTIN G MORGAN ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A020994; Amount: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less