This case was last updated from Broward County Courts on 02/27/2020 at 02:41:51 (UTC).

Richard A Henry DC PA Plaintiff vs. State Farm Mutual Automibile Insurance Company Defendant

Case Summary

On 02/22/2018 Richard A Henry DC PA Plaintiff filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against State Farm Mutual Automibile Insurance Company Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Courts, West Regional Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DePrimo, Natasha. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2326

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Broward County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Regional Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DePrimo, Natasha

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Richard A Henry DC PA

Wilson, Unika

Defendant

State Farm Mutual Automibile Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Morgan, Justin G

Attorney at Law Offices of Justin G. Morgan, P.A

2500 Weston Road, Suite 211

Weston, FL 33331

Defendant Attorney

Wilson, Sherline Cameron

Attorney at Mimi L Smith & Associates

250 S Orange Ave, Ste 600

Orlando, FL 32801

 

Court Documents

Agreed Order

11/27/2019 - Agreed Order

Notice of Cancellation

11/20/2019 - Notice of Cancellation

Notice of Hearing

10/10/2019 - Notice of Hearing

Motion to Stay

10/7/2019 - Motion to Stay

Agreed Order Granting

9/23/2019 - Agreed Order Granting

Motion to Amend Complaint

9/18/2019 - Motion to Amend Complaint

Notice of Unavailability

12/10/2018 - Notice of Unavailability

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

6/7/2018 - Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Notice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories

6/7/2018 - Notice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories

Response to Request to Produce

6/7/2018 - Response to Request to Produce

Privilege Log

6/7/2018 - Privilege Log

Motion to Strike Affirmative Defenses

5/21/2018 - Motion to Strike Affirmative Defenses

Response to Request for Admissions

5/7/2018 - Response to Request for Admissions

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

4/24/2018 - Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

3/28/2018 - Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

Notice of Appearance

3/9/2018 - Notice of Appearance

eSummons Issuance - Pretrial

2/22/2018 - eSummons Issuance - Pretrial

Statement of Claim (eFiled)

2/22/2018 - Statement of Claim (eFiled)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAgreed Order; ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES/GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Cancellation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Stay; Party: Plaintiff Richard A Henry DC PA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAgreed Order Granting; Agreed Order on Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend The Complaint By Interlineation (Granted.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Amend Complaint; By Interlineation; Party: Plaintiff Richard A Henry DC PA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Unavailability; Party: Plaintiff Richard A Henry DC PA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 05/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Strike Affirmative Defenses; and Reply

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer & Affirmative Defenses; Party: Defendant State Farm Mutual Automibile Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • HearingPIP Pre-trial Hearing; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Judicial Officer(s): 82 DePrimo, Natasha; Location: West Courtroom 260; CANCELED: Cancelled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Appearance; Party: Defendant State Farm Mutual Automibile Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance - Pretrial; Party: Defendant State Farm Mutual Automibile Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim (eFiled)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: JUSTIN G MORGAN ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A027402; Amount: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid; Payor: JUSTIN G MORGAN ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A027402; Amount: $175.00

    Read MoreRead Less