This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 11/19/2020 at 21:02:19 (UTC).

Red Diamond Inc Plaintiff vs. Scrubyco Inc Defendant

Case Summary

On 09/27/2016 Red Diamond Inc Plaintiff filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Scrubyco Inc Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Di Pietro, Nina W.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1184

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Broward County Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Di Pietro, Nina W.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Red Diamond Inc

Defendant

Scrubyco Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Slusher, Jeremy E, ESQ.

Attorney at Slusher & Rosenblum, P.A.

444 W. Railroad Ave.,, Suite 470

West Palm Beach, FL 33401

 

Court Documents

Summons Returned Served

10/27/2016 - Summons Returned Served

eSummons Issuance (No Fee)

10/13/2016 - eSummons Issuance (No Fee)

Complaint

9/27/2016 - Complaint

eSummons Not Issued - Atty advised

9/27/2016 - eSummons Not Issued - Atty advised

Statement of Claim (eFiled)

9/27/2016 - Statement of Claim (eFiled)

Notice of Dismissal

11/7/2016 - Notice of Dismissal

Disposition Order on Pretrial Conference

11/8/2016 - Disposition Order on Pretrial Conference

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/08/2016
  • HearingPretrial Hearing; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Judicial Officer(s): 49 Di Pietro, Nina W.; Location: Central Ctroom 400

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionDisposition Order on Pretrial Conference; Comment (THIS CASE IS DIMSISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE ); Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; 1 Pages; Instrument Number: 114036971

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2016
  • DispositionDisposed by Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionNotice of Dismissal; Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; 1 Pages; Instrument Number: 114041641

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Served; 26th day of October, 2016; Party: Defendant Scrubyco Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance (No Fee)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2016
  • DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: JEREMY E. SLUSHER ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20161FA1A137939; Amount: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2016
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid; Payor: JEREMY E. SLUSHER ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20161FA1A137939; Amount: $300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Not Issued - Atty advised

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim (eFiled)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Red Diamond Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Slusher, Jeremy E, ESQ.