This case was last updated from Broward County Courts on 03/11/2021 at 16:18:21 (UTC).

Realty Income Corporation Plaintiff vs. Ronald Coleman Enterprises Inc Defendant

Case Summary

On 04/29/2015 Realty Income Corporation Plaintiff filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against Ronald Coleman Enterprises Inc Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Courts, North Regional Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Hurley, John. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2325

  • Filing Date:

    04/29/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • Courthouse:

    North Regional Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Hurley, John

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Realty Income Corporation

Realty Income Properties Inc

Defendants

Ronald Coleman Enterprises Inc

Ronald Coleman Enterprises LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Minerley, Kenneth Louis

Attorney at Minerley Fein, P.A.

1200 N Federal Highway, Suite 420

Boca Raton, FL 33432

Defendant Attorney

Berger, Michael B

Attorney at Carpenter & Berger PL

6400 North Andrews Avenue, Suite 370

Ft Lauderdale, FL 33309

 

Court Documents

Stipulation for Dismissal

7/21/2015 - Stipulation for Dismissal

Order Requiring Rent Money Into Ct Reg

5/22/2015 - Order Requiring Rent Money Into Ct Reg

Answer to Complaint

5/12/2015 - Answer to Complaint

Certificate of Mailing

5/5/2015 - Certificate of Mailing

Summons Returned Served

5/5/2015 - Summons Returned Served

Civil Cover Sheet

4/29/2015 - Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint (eFiled)

4/29/2015 - Complaint (eFiled)

eSummons Issuance

4/29/2015 - eSummons Issuance

Order of Dismissal With Prejudice

8/12/2015 - Order of Dismissal With Prejudice

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionOrder of Dismissal With Prejudice; Comment ((08/12/15) ); Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; 1 Pages; Instrument Number: 113179196

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2015
  • DispositionDisposed by Judge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation for Dismissal; FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Requiring Rent Money Into Ct Reg; ($52, 946.12) as accrued past due rent plus fees on or before thursday, may 28, 2015 before 12:00 pm (05/22/15)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint; Party: Defendant Ronald Coleman Enterprises Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Served; 5/05/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2015
  • DocketNo Mail Out

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2015
  • DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: KENNETH MINERLEY ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20151FA1A059310; Amount: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2015
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid; Payor: KENNETH MINERLEY ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20151FA1A059310; Amount: $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet; Party: Plaintiff Realty Income Corporation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint (eFiled); FOR EVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; Party: Plaintiff Realty Income Corporation

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where REALTY INCOME CORPORATION A CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where REALTY INCOME PROPERTIES INC is a litigant