This case was last updated from Broward County Courts on 02/26/2020 at 21:39:31 (UTC).

Rapid Response Team LLC Plaintiff vs. Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company Defendant

Case Summary

On 02/13/2018 Rapid Response Team LLC Plaintiff filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Universal Property Casualty Insurance Company Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Courts, West Regional Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Francois, Phoebee. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2016

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Broward County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Regional Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Francois, Phoebee

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Rapid Response Team LLC

King, Thomas

Defendant

Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Nieto, Maria Antonia

Attorney at The Diener Firm P.A.

8751 W Broward Blvd., Suite 404

Plantation, FL 33324

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

2/14/2018 - Civil Cover Sheet

Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses

2/14/2018 - Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses

Amended Complaint

2/14/2018 - Amended Complaint

Request for Production of Documents

2/14/2018 - Request for Production of Documents

Notice of Service of Interrogs

2/14/2018 - Notice of Service of Interrogs

e-Summons Issuance - On Amended Pretrial

2/14/2018 - e-Summons Issuance - On Amended Pretrial

Summons Returned Unserved/Unexecuted

2/14/2018 - Summons Returned Unserved/Unexecuted

Civil Cover Sheet

2/13/2018 - Civil Cover Sheet

eSummons Issuance - Pretrial

2/13/2018 - eSummons Issuance - Pretrial

Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses

2/13/2018 - Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses

Statement of Claim (eFiled)

2/13/2018 - Statement of Claim (eFiled)

Request for Production

2/13/2018 - Request for Production

Notice of Service of Interrogs

2/13/2018 - Notice of Service of Interrogs

Notice of Voluntary Dismissal W/Prejudice

3/13/2018 - Notice of Voluntary Dismissal W/Prejudice

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2018
  • HearingPretrial Hearing; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Judicial Officer(s): 81 Francois, Phoebee; Location: West Courtroom 240; CANCELED: Disposed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionNotice of Voluntary Dismissal W/Prejudice; Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; 1 Pages; Instrument Number: 114943528

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • DispositionDismissed, Settled or Disposed Before Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid; Payor: ERIK D. DIENER ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A022824; Amount: $300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: ERIK D. DIENER ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A022824; Amount: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet; Amended

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses; Amended.//

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmended Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Production of Documents; Amended; Party: Plaintiff Rapid Response Team LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogs; Amended; Party: Plaintiff Rapid Response Team LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Dockete-Summons Issuance - On Amended Pretrial; Party: Defendant Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Unserved/Unexecuted; Party: Defendant Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: ERIK D. DIENER ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A023117; Amount: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance - Pretrial; Party: Defendant Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim (eFiled)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Production; Party: Plaintiff Rapid Response Team LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogs; Party: Plaintiff Rapid Response Team LLC

    Read MoreRead Less