This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 05/05/2023 at 13:57:05 (UTC).

Rafael Delgado, et al Plaintiff vs. Gladys Roman, et al Defendant

Case Summary

On 01/12/2022 Rafael Delgado, Plaintiff filed an Other lawsuit against Gladys Roman, Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Bowman, John B.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0570

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Bowman, John B.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Delgado, Rafael

Delgado, Marilyn

Defendants

Roman, Gladys

Morales, Francisco

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Lehner, Steven D, ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement

8/5/2022 - Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement

Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement

8/5/2022 - Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

6/30/2022 - Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

6/30/2022 - Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Response to Request for Production

6/30/2022 - Response to Request for Production

Motion for Default & Default

6/28/2022 - Motion for Default & Default

Motion to Compel Discovery

6/13/2022 - Motion to Compel Discovery

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

3/31/2022 - Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Response to Request for Admissions

3/31/2022 - Response to Request for Admissions

Response to Request for Production

3/31/2022 - Response to Request for Production

Answer to Complaint

3/21/2022 - Answer to Complaint

Request for Production

3/21/2022 - Request for Production

Notice of Service of Interrogs

3/21/2022 - Notice of Service of Interrogs

Notice of Service of Interrogs

3/21/2022 - Notice of Service of Interrogs

Summons Returned Served

2/18/2022 - Summons Returned Served

Summons Returned Served

2/1/2022 - Summons Returned Served

Request for Admissions

1/20/2022 - Request for Admissions

Request for Production

1/20/2022 - Request for Production

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

11/30/2022
View Court Documents

DispositionDisposition(s): Notice of Dismissal; Comment (WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO SETTLEMENT ); Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; Pages: 1; Instrument Number: 118546442

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/30/2022

DispositionDisposed by Default

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/05/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/05/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/30/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/30/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/30/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Response to Request for Production

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/28/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Motion for Default & Default; Additional Text; Party: Defendant Morales, Francisco

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/13/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Motion to Compel Discovery; Additional Text; DEFENDANT GLADYS ROMAN'S MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY RESPONSES

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/31/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
01/20/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Request for Admissions

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/20/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Request for Production

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/20/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Request for Production

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/20/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Notice of Service of Interrogs

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/20/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Notice of Service of Interrogs

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/20/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: eSummons Issuance; Additional Text; Gladys Roman

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/20/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: eSummons Issuance; Additional Text; Francisco Morales

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/12/2022

DocketDescription: Per AOSC20-23 Amd12, Case is determined General

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/12/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Civil Cover Sheet; Additional Text; Amount: $100,001.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/12/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Complaint (eFiled); Additional Text; Party: Plaintiff Delgado, Rafael Plaintiff Delgado, Marilyn

[+] Read More [-] Read Less