This case was last updated from Broward County Courts on 02/26/2020 at 21:49:09 (UTC).

Qualcare Medical Group LLC Plaintiff vs. Geico General Insurance Company Defendant

Case Summary

On 02/14/2018 Qualcare Medical Group LLC Plaintiff filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Geico General Insurance Company Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Courts, West Regional Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Francois, Phoebee. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2021

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Broward County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Regional Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Francois, Phoebee

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Radiology Consultants of Hollywood Inc

Qualcare Medical Group LLC

Moran, Jennifer

Pines Radiology Center

Defendant

Geico General Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Thomann, Michelle Ann

111 North Pine Island Road, Ste 103

Plantation, FL 33324

 

Court Documents

Supplemental Request to Produce

1/31/2019 - Supplemental Request to Produce

Notice of Intent

1/31/2019 - Notice of Intent

Reply to Affirmative Defenses

1/22/2019 - Reply to Affirmative Defenses

Answer to Amended Complaint

1/22/2019 - Answer to Amended Complaint

Agreed Order

12/4/2018 - Agreed Order

Motion to Amend Complaint

7/9/2018 - Motion to Amend Complaint

Notice of Hearing

6/28/2018 - Notice of Hearing

Order Compelling Discovery

6/19/2018 - Order Compelling Discovery

Motion to Compel Discovery

6/15/2018 - Motion to Compel Discovery

Motion for Default

5/25/2018 - Motion for Default

Summons on Insurance Commissioner Returned Served

4/17/2018 - Summons on Insurance Commissioner Returned Served

Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

3/27/2018 - Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

Request for Production

3/27/2018 - Request for Production

Request for Admissions

3/27/2018 - Request for Admissions

Interrogatories & Notice of Service

3/27/2018 - Interrogatories & Notice of Service

eSummons Issuance - Pretrial

2/14/2018 - eSummons Issuance - Pretrial

Statement of Claim (eFiled)

2/14/2018 - Statement of Claim (eFiled)

Notice of Voluntary Dismissal W/Out Prejudice

2/14/2019 - Notice of Voluntary Dismissal W/Out Prejudice

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionNotice of Voluntary Dismissal W/Out Prejudice; Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; 1 Pages; Instrument Number: 115619637

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • DispositionDismissed, Settled or Disposed Before Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSupplemental Request to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Intent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReply to Affirmative Defenses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Amended Complaint; AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Party: Defendant Geico General Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAgreed Order; GRANTING MO/AMEND STATEMENT OF CLAIM TO RELECT PROPER PLTF'S NAME--QUALCARE MEDICAL GROUP LLC DBA PINES RADIOLOGY CENTER A/A/0 JENNIFER MORAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Amend Complaint; Party: Plaintiff Radiology Consultants of Hollywood Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Cancellation; Friday, July 20, 2018 @ 11:00 A.M. - Plaintiff's Motion For Entry of Default; Party: Plaintiff Radiology Consultants of Hollywood Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 04/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Insurance Commissioner Returned Served; 2/14/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • HearingPIP Pre-trial Hearing; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Judicial Officer(s): 81 Francois, Phoebee; Location: West Courtroom 260; CANCELED: Cancelled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Production

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInterrogatories & Notice of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance - Pretrial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim (eFiled)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid; Payor: ABDUL-SUMI DALAL ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A023040; Amount: $80.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: ABDUL-SUMI DALAL ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A023040; Amount: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less