This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 06/11/2020 at 22:04:28 (UTC).

Pure Indoor Solutions Plaintiff vs. Safety Specialty Insurance Company Defendant

Case Summary

On 03/22/2019 Pure Indoor Solutions Plaintiff filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Safety Specialty Insurance Company Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Phillips, Carol-Lisa. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6363

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    Broward County Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Phillips, Carol-Lisa

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Pure Indoor Solutions

Pompano Beach Club North

Defendant

Safety Specialty Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Bennett, Jabari Akil

Attorney at Cohen Law Group PA

350 North Lake Destiny Rd

Maitland, FL 32751-4103

Defendant Attorneys

Beilman, Vincent Paul, III

Attorney at Wood Smith Henning & Berman LLP

701 Brickell Avenue, Suite 1640

Miami, FL 33131

Jones, Kimberly G

101 E Kennedy Blvd Ste 1840

Tampa, FL 33602-5187

 

Court Documents

Motion for Extension of Time

6/19/2019 - Motion for Extension of Time

Notice of Appearance

4/23/2019 - Notice of Appearance

Motion for Extension of Time

4/23/2019 - Motion for Extension of Time

Notice of Filing

4/4/2019 - Notice of Filing

Appearance As Attorney of Record

4/4/2019 - Appearance As Attorney of Record

Complaint (eFiled)

3/22/2019 - Complaint (eFiled)

eSummons Issuance

3/22/2019 - eSummons Issuance

Civil Cover Sheet

3/22/2019 - Civil Cover Sheet

Notice of Service of Interrogs

3/22/2019 - Notice of Service of Interrogs

Request for Admissions

3/22/2019 - Request for Admissions

Request to Produce

3/22/2019 - Request to Produce

Notice of Voluntary Dismissal W/Prejudice

11/11/2019 - Notice of Voluntary Dismissal W/Prejudice

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionNotice of Voluntary Dismissal W/Prejudice; Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; 1 Pages; Instrument Number: 116172103

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2019
  • DispositionDismissed Before Hearing - Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Extension of Time; Party: Defendant Safety Specialty Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Appearance; Party: Defendant Safety Specialty Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Extension of Time; Party: Defendant Safety Specialty Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing; Party: Plaintiff Pure Indoor Solutions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAppearance As Attorney of Record; NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND EMAIL DESIGNATION; Party: Plaintiff Pure Indoor Solutions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • DocketFiling Fee; Payor: ISABEL ARIAS ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20191FA1A042992; Amount: $401.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: ISABEL ARIAS ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20191FA1A042992; Amount: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint (eFiled)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; Safety Specialty Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogs; DEFENDANT; Party: Plaintiff Pure Indoor Solutions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions; DEFENDANT; Party: Plaintiff Pure Indoor Solutions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce; DEFENDANT; Party: Plaintiff Pure Indoor Solutions

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Pompano Beach Club North Ass'n, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where SAFETY SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer VINCENT BEILMAN, ESQ