This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 06/30/2023 at 23:24:14 (UTC).

Publix Super Markets, Inc. Plaintiff vs. Thomas Kennedy Defendant

Case Summary

On 09/14/2020 Publix Super Markets, Inc Plaintiff filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against Thomas Kennedy Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Bidwill, Martin J.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5076

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Bidwill, Martin J.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Publix Super Markets, Inc.

Defendant

Kennedy, Thomas

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lynch, Samuel Brendan

 

Court Documents

eSummons Issuance

9/14/2020 - eSummons Issuance

eSummons Issuance

9/14/2020 - eSummons Issuance

eSummons Issuance

9/14/2020 - eSummons Issuance

Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses

9/14/2020 - Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses

Petition (eFiled)

9/14/2020 - Petition (eFiled)

Civil Cover Sheet

9/14/2020 - Civil Cover Sheet

Stipulation for Dismissal

2/24/2021 - Stipulation for Dismissal

Final Order of Dismissal

2/25/2021 - Final Order of Dismissal

Notice of Voluntary Dismissal W/Out Prejudice

10/19/2021 - Notice of Voluntary Dismissal W/Out Prejudice

Search for prior case performed per 2020-4-Civ-UFC-CO

9/14/2020 - Search for prior case performed per 2020-4-Civ-UFC-CO

Notice of Appearance

10/6/2020 - Notice of Appearance

Notice of Appearance

10/12/2020 - Notice of Appearance

Answer to Complaint

10/12/2020 - Answer to Complaint

Answer to Complaint

10/12/2020 - Answer to Complaint

Circuit - Notice LOP Order to Show Cause Notice of Hearing

8/17/2021 - Circuit - Notice LOP Order to Show Cause Notice of Hearing

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

10/19/2021
View Court Documents

DispositionDisposition(s): Notice of Voluntary Dismissal W/Out Prejudice; Comment (Defendant, THOMAS KENNEDY ); Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; Pages: 2; Instrument Number: 117672135

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/19/2021

DispositionDismissed Before Hearing - Other

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/17/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Circuit - Notice LOP Order to Show Cause Notice of Hearing

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/25/2021
View Court Documents

DispositionDisposition(s): Final Order of Dismissal; Comment (Defendants, MARTY KIAR AND JIM ZINGALE ); Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; Pages: 1; Instrument Number: 117084132

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/24/2021
View Court Documents

DispositionDisposition(s): Stipulation for Dismissal; Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; Pages: 3; Instrument Number: 117078264

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/12/2020
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Answer to Complaint; Additional Text; Party: Defendant Zingale, Jim

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/12/2020
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Answer to Complaint; Additional Text; Party: Defendant Kiar, Marty

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/12/2020
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Notice of Appearance; Additional Text; Party: Defendant Kiar, Marty

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/06/2020
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Notice of Appearance; Additional Text; AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES; Party: Defendant Zingale, Jim

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2020
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Civil Cover Sheet; Additional Text; Amount: $75,001.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2020
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Complaint; Additional Text; Party: Plaintiff Publix Super Markets, Inc.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2020
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses; Additional Text; brendan.lynch@lowndes-law.com /litcontrol@lowndes-law.com/ tracy.kennison@lowndes-law.com

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2020
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: eSummons Issuance; Additional Text; Party: Defendant Kiar, Marty

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2020
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: eSummons Issuance; Additional Text; Party: Defendant Kennedy, Thomas

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2020
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: eSummons Issuance; Additional Text; Party: Defendant Zingale, Jim

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2020
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Search for prior case performed per 2020-4-Civ-UFC-CO; Additional Text; none

[+] Read More [-] Read Less