This case was last updated from Broward County Courts on 12/02/2020 at 22:35:53 (UTC).

Progressive Select Ins Co Plaintiff vs. Lesley Martin, et al Defendant

Case Summary

On 02/14/2016 Progressive Select Ins Co Plaintiff filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Lesley Martin, Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Courts, Broward County West Regional Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Feld, Ellen. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2228

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Feld, Ellen

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Progressive Select Ins Co

Roach, Venatta

Defendants

Martin, Lesley

B&L Services Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Breitner, Jordan

Attorney at Markcity, Rothman, Cantwell & Breitner, P.A

Sabadell Financial Center, 150 S Pine Island Road #250

Plantation, FL 33324

 

Court Documents

Order of Dismissal Without Prejudice

5/5/2016 - Order of Dismissal Without Prejudice

eSummons Issuance - Pretrial

2/14/2016 - eSummons Issuance - Pretrial

eSummons Issuance - Pretrial

2/14/2016 - eSummons Issuance - Pretrial

Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses

2/14/2016 - Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses

Statement of Claim (eFiled)

2/14/2016 - Statement of Claim (eFiled)

Civil Cover Sheet

2/14/2016 - Civil Cover Sheet

Summons Returned Served

3/9/2016 - Summons Returned Served

Summons Returned Served

3/9/2016 - Summons Returned Served

Motion

3/23/2016 - Motion

Motion

3/23/2016 - Motion

Notice of Hearing

4/6/2016 - Notice of Hearing

Disposition Order on Pretrial Conference

4/20/2016 - Disposition Order on Pretrial Conference

Notice of Change of Address

9/12/2016 - Notice of Change of Address

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address; Party: Plaintiff Progressive Select Ins Co

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionOrder of Dismissal Without Prejudice; Comment (transferring cause to arbitration ); Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; 1 Pages; Instrument Number: 113675944

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2016
  • DispositionDismissed, Settled or Disposed After Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDisposition Order on Pretrial Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2016
  • HearingPretrial Hearing; Hearing Time: 2:00 PM; Judicial Officer(s): 83 Feld, Ellen; Location: West Courtroom 240

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; May 5, 2016 at 10 am

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion; TO REFER CAUSE TO ARBITRATION (EX-PARTE MOTION); Party: Attorney Breitner, Jordan; Party: Plaintiff Progressive Select Ins Co

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion; TO REFER CAUSE TO ARBITRATION - (AMENDED EX-PARTE MOTION); Party: Attorney Breitner, Jordan; Party: Plaintiff Progressive Select Ins Co

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Served; 02-16-16; Party: Defendant B&L Services Inc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Served; 02-20-16

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2016
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid; Payor: MICHAEL R MARKCITY ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20161FA1A018025; Amount: $175.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2016
  • DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: MICHAEL R MARKCITY ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20161FA1A018025; Amount: $10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2016
  • DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: MICHAEL R MARKCITY ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20161FA1A018025; Amount: $10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim (eFiled)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance - Pretrial; Party: Defendant Martin, Lesley

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance - Pretrial; Party: Defendant B&L Services Inc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less