This case was last updated from Broward County Courts on 02/26/2020 at 23:53:03 (UTC).

Progressive American Ins Co Plaintiff vs. Peter Henry Kennedy Defendant

Case Summary

On 02/17/2018 Progressive American Ins Co Plaintiff filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Peter Henry Kennedy Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Courts, West Regional Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Francois, Phoebee. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2146

  • Filing Date:

    02/17/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    Broward County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Regional Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Francois, Phoebee

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Progressive American Ins Co

Stefanie Grife

Defendant

Kennedy, Peter Henry

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Breitner, Jordan

Attorney at Markcity, Rothman, Cantwell & Breitner, P.A

Sabadell Financial Center, 150 S Pine Island Road #250

Plantation, FL 33324

Defendant Attorney

Flores, Oscar A, ESQ.

Attorney at LDP LAW & ASSOCIATES

Po Box 452799

Sunrise, FL 33345

 

Court Documents

Notice of Mediation

12/6/2019 - Notice of Mediation

Agreed Order

10/22/2019 - Agreed Order

Motion to Appear Telephonically

10/21/2019 - Motion to Appear Telephonically

Notice of Cancellation

10/11/2019 - Notice of Cancellation

Notice of Mediation

10/7/2019 - Notice of Mediation

Notice of Hearing

7/17/2019 - Notice of Hearing

Motion for Sanctions

3/12/2019 - Motion for Sanctions

Response to Request for Admissions

12/6/2018 - Response to Request for Admissions

Notice of Supplemental Interrogs

12/3/2018 - Notice of Supplemental Interrogs

Request for Production

12/3/2018 - Request for Production

Request for Admissions

12/3/2018 - Request for Admissions

Answer Affirmative Defenses & Counterclaim

11/21/2018 - Answer Affirmative Defenses & Counterclaim

Notice of Appearance

11/9/2018 - Notice of Appearance

Summons Returned Served

5/10/2018 - Summons Returned Served

Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses

2/17/2018 - Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses

eSummons Issuance

2/17/2018 - eSummons Issuance

Complaint (eFiled)

2/17/2018 - Complaint (eFiled)

Civil Cover Sheet

2/17/2018 - Civil Cover Sheet

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Mediation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAgreed Order; Granting mo/sanctions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Appear Telephonically; Party: Defendant Kennedy, Peter Henry

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Serving Proposal for Settlement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmended Notice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Cancellation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmended; Notice of Mediation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Mediation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Sanctions; Party: Attorney Breitner, Jordan; Party: Plaintiff Progressive American Ins Co

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 11/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer Affirmative Defenses & Counterclaim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; Party: Defendant Kennedy, Peter Henry

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Appearance; Party: Defendant Kennedy, Peter Henry

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Served; 4/24/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2018
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid; Payor: JORDAN M BREITNER ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A025166; Amount: $300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2018
  • DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: JORDAN M BREITNER ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A025166; Amount: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses; Party: Plaintiff Progressive American Ins Co

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint (eFiled)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less