This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 09/27/2020 at 03:06:55 (UTC).

Prisa II Davie SC LLC Plaintiff vs. GCGZ Food LLC Defendant

Case Summary

On 09/22/2020 Prisa II Davie SC LLC Plaintiff filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against GCGZ Food LLC Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Frink, Keathan B.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5576

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • Court:

    Broward County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Broward County Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Frink, Keathan B.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Prisa II Davie SC LLC

Defendant

GCGZ Food LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Sarrow, Jeffrey A

10055 Yamato Rd. Ste 105

Boca Raton, FL 33498

 

Court Documents

Search for prior case performed per 2020-4-Civ-UFC-CO

9/23/2020 - Search for prior case performed per 2020-4-Civ-UFC-CO

Complaint (eFiled)

9/22/2020 - Complaint (eFiled)

Civil Cover Sheet

9/22/2020 - Civil Cover Sheet

eSummons Issuance

9/22/2020 - eSummons Issuance

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSearch for prior case performed per 2020-4-Civ-UFC-CO; NONE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint (eFiled)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet; Amount: $30,001.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; GCGZ FOOD, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less