This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 06/17/2022 at 18:47:05 (UTC).

Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC Plaintiff vs. Stephanie Coradin, et al Defendant

Case Summary

On 04/15/2022 Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC Plaintiff filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against Stephanie Coradin, Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is McCarthy, Kathleen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1993

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

McCarthy, Kathleen

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC

Defendants

Coradin, Stephanie

Dembo Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Greenbaum, David M

120 Corporate Boulevard

Norfolk, VA 23502

 

Court Documents

Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

4/15/2022 - Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

eSummons Issuance - Pretrial

4/15/2022 - eSummons Issuance - Pretrial

eSummons Issuance - Pretrial

4/15/2022 - eSummons Issuance - Pretrial

Statement of Claim (eFiled)

4/15/2022 - Statement of Claim (eFiled)

Civil Cover Sheet

4/15/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet

Summons Served - Substitute Service

4/27/2022 - Summons Served - Substitute Service

Summons Returned Served

4/27/2022 - Summons Returned Served

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/22/2022
  • HearingCredit Card - Pretrial Hearing; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Judicial Officer(s): 47 McCarthy, Kathleen; Location: Courtroom WW5150

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Served; DEMBO INC served on 04/26/22 @ 4:59 pm

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Served - Substitute Service; 4/26/22; Party: Defendant Coradin, Stephanie

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet; Amount: $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim (eFiled)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance - Pretrial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance - Pretrial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less