This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 05/18/2022 at 16:02:41 (UTC).

Pompano Beach Club North Association, Inc. Plaintiff vs. Otis Elevator Company Defendant

Case Summary

On 05/17/2022 Pompano Beach Club North Association, Inc Plaintiff filed an Other lawsuit against Otis Elevator Company Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Frink, Keathan B.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7135

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Frink, Keathan B.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Pompano Beach Club North Association, Inc.

Defendant

Otis Elevator Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Schwarzfeld, Lauren Tanya

Attorney at Kaye Bender Rembaum PL

1200 Park Central Blvd South

Pompano Beach, FL 33064

 

Court Documents

eSummons Issuance

5/17/2022 - eSummons Issuance

Complaint (eFiled)

5/17/2022 - Complaint (eFiled)

Civil Cover Sheet

5/17/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet

Clerk's Certificate of Compliance W-2020-73CIV/2020-74-UFC

8/17/2022 - Clerk's Certificate of Compliance W-2020-73CIV/2020-74-UFC

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Compliance W-2020-73CIV/2020-74-UFC; NONE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketPer AOSC20-23 Amd12, Case is determined General

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet; Amount: $30,001.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint (eFiled); Party: Plaintiff Pompano Beach Club North Association, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; Party: Defendant Otis Elevator Company

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Pompano Beach Club North Ass'n, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Otis Elevator Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCHWARZFELD , LAUREN T