This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 02/16/2021 at 01:22:19 (UTC).

Pompano Beach Club North Assn Inc Plaintiff vs. Maxim Construction Group Corp Defendant

Case Summary

On 09/24/2015 Pompano Beach Club North Assn Inc Plaintiff filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Maxim Construction Group Corp Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Perlman, Sandra. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7076

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Broward County Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Perlman, Sandra

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Pompano Beach Club North Assn Inc

Defendant

Maxim Construction Group Corp

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ammendola, Michele

Attorney at Becker & Poliakoff P.A.

1 E Broward Blvd Ste 1800

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301-1876

Defendant Attorneys

Wilder, Leonard

Attorney at Bakalar & Associates PA

12472 West Atlantic Boulevard

Coral Springs, FL 33071

Owens, Karissa Louise

Attorney at RISSMAN, BARRETT, HURT, DONAHUE, McLAIN & MANGAN, P.A

6451 N. Federal Highway, Suite 400

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33308

 

Court Documents

Joint Stipulation

9/25/2017 - Joint Stipulation

Supplemental Request to Produce

2/27/2017 - Supplemental Request to Produce

Notice of Cancellation

1/18/2017 - Notice of Cancellation

Response

1/18/2017 - Response

Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum

1/9/2017 - Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum

Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum

1/9/2017 - Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum

Request for Copies

1/3/2017 - Request for Copies

Certificate of No Objection

1/3/2017 - Certificate of No Objection

Notice of Production From Non-Party

8/10/2016 - Notice of Production From Non-Party

Response

5/26/2016 - Response

Notice of Filing

5/9/2016 - Notice of Filing

Certificate of No Objection

5/4/2016 - Certificate of No Objection

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

4/11/2016 - Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Certificate of Service of Interrogatories

4/1/2016 - Certificate of Service of Interrogatories

Response to Request for Production

3/17/2016 - Response to Request for Production

Agreed Order

2/1/2016 - Agreed Order

Notice of Appearance

12/18/2015 - Notice of Appearance

Alias Summons Returned Served

12/4/2015 - Alias Summons Returned Served

190 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDirections to the Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionFinal Order of Dismissal; Comment (WITH PREJUDICE AS TO MAXIM CONSTRUCTION GROUP, CORP ); Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; 3 Pages; Instrument Number: 114634307

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • DispositionDisposed by Default

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJoint Stipulation; OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO MAXIM CONSTRUCTION GROUP, CORP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate; OF SETTLEMENT AUTHORITY; Party: Plaintiff Pompano Beach Club North Assn Inc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate; OF AUTHORITY; Party: Defendant Maxim Construction Group Corp

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Unavailability

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Unavailability

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Compliance; WITH REQUEST FOR COPIES; Party: Defendant Maxim Construction Group Corp

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
186 More Docket Entries
  • 11/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Production; FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT, MAXIM CONSTRUCTION GROUP, CORP; Party: Plaintiff Pompano Beach Club North Assn Inc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Service of Interrogatories; PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF INSURANCE INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT, MAXIM CONSTRUCTION GROUP, CORP; Party: Plaintiff Pompano Beach Club North Assn Inc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Unavailability; Party: Attorney Ammendola, Michele

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2015
  • DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: MICHELE AMMENDOLA ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20151FA1A154157; Amount: $10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance - Alias; To: Maxim Construction Group, Corp, a Florida Corporation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2015
  • DocketFiling Fee; Payor: MICHELE AMMENDOLA ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20151FA1A140324; Amount: $401.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2015
  • DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: MICHELE AMMENDOLA ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20151FA1A140324; Amount: $10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint (eFiled); Party: Plaintiff Pompano Beach Club North Assn Inc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; Party: Defendant Maxim Construction Group Corp

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Pompano Beach Club North Ass'n, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Maxim Construction Group, Corp. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Owens, Karissa Louise

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Leonard Wilder