This case was last updated from Broward County Courts on 02/26/2020 at 20:30:05 (UTC).

PMC Deerfield LLC Plaintiff vs. Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company Defendant

Case Summary

On 02/22/2019 PMC Deerfield LLC Plaintiff filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Courts, West Regional Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Feld, Ellen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3284

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Broward County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Regional Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Feld, Ellen

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PMC Deerfield LLC

Lowell, Beth

Defendant

Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Daly, John C, Jr.

Attorney at Law Office of John C. Daly PA

8551 W. Sunrise Blvd., Ste#304

Plantation, FL 33322

Defendant Attorney

Lamontagne, Rachel M

Attorney at Shutts & Bowen LLP

200 South Biscayne Blvd, Suite 4100

Miami, FL 33131

 

Court Documents

Motion to Dismiss

2/14/2020 - Motion to Dismiss

Agreed Order

12/15/2019 - Agreed Order

Notice of Cancellation

12/11/2019 - Notice of Cancellation

Notice of Hearing

9/26/2019 - Notice of Hearing

Motion to Compel Discovery

8/22/2019 - Motion to Compel Discovery

Motion for Enlargement of Time

5/30/2019 - Motion for Enlargement of Time

Motion to Dismiss

4/15/2019 - Motion to Dismiss

Notice of Filing

4/11/2019 - Notice of Filing

Notice of Filing Deposition

4/11/2019 - Notice of Filing Deposition

Request for Production

4/11/2019 - Request for Production

Request for Admissions

4/11/2019 - Request for Admissions

Notice of Service of Interrogs

4/11/2019 - Notice of Service of Interrogs

Disposition Order on Pretrial Conference

3/27/2019 - Disposition Order on Pretrial Conference

Notice of Appearance

3/26/2019 - Notice of Appearance

Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

3/26/2019 - Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

Notice of Filing

3/26/2019 - Notice of Filing

Statement of Claim (eFiled)

2/22/2019 - Statement of Claim (eFiled)

eSummons Issuance - Pretrial

2/22/2019 - eSummons Issuance - Pretrial

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Dismiss; Party: Defendant Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAgreed Order; on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Complaint And/Or Motion for More Definite Statement And Defendant's Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Discovery Requests

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Cancellation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Compel Discovery; RESPONSES; Party: Plaintiff PMC Deerfield LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Enlargement of Time; Party: Defendant Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Dismiss; Party: Defendant Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing Deposition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Production

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDisposition Order on Pretrial Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • HearingPIP Pre-trial Hearing; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Judicial Officer(s): 83 Feld, Ellen; Location: West Courtroom 240

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Appearance; Party: Defendant Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing; NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS; Party: Plaintiff PMC Deerfield LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim (eFiled)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance - Pretrial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid; Payor: JOHN DALY ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20191FA1A029116; Amount: $55.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: JOHN DALY ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20191FA1A029116; Amount: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less