This case was last updated from Broward County Courts on 06/21/2020 at 19:52:25 (UTC).

Plantation Open MRI LLC Plaintiff vs. Geico General Insurance Company Defendant

Case Summary

On 05/28/2020 Plantation Open MRI LLC Plaintiff filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Geico General Insurance Company Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Courts, Broward County South Regional Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6732

  • Filing Date:

    05/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Plantation Open MRI LLC

Carcamo, Angel

Defendant

Geico General Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Storani, Sean Alexander, ESQ.

Attorney at Sean A. Storani, P.L.

1806 North Flamingo Road, Suite #324

Pembroke Pines, FL 33028

 

Court Documents

Motion for Summary Judgment

5/28/2020 - Motion for Summary Judgment

Motion to Compel

5/28/2020 - Motion to Compel

Motion to Compel

5/28/2020 - Motion to Compel

Notice of Taking Deposition

5/28/2020 - Notice of Taking Deposition

Notice of Service of Interrogs

5/28/2020 - Notice of Service of Interrogs

Notice of Service of Interrogs

5/28/2020 - Notice of Service of Interrogs

Request for Admissions

5/28/2020 - Request for Admissions

Statement of Claim (eFiled)

5/28/2020 - Statement of Claim (eFiled)

eSummons Issuance - Pretrial

5/28/2020 - eSummons Issuance - Pretrial

Civil Cover Sheet

5/28/2020 - Civil Cover Sheet

Notice of Service on Ins Commissioner

6/4/2020 - Notice of Service on Ins Commissioner

Notice of Filing

6/4/2020 - Notice of Filing

Confession of Judgment

6/8/2020 - Confession of Judgment

Motion to Tax Costs

6/8/2020 - Motion to Tax Costs

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/15/2020
  • HearingPIP Pre-trial Hearing; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Judicial Officer(s): 60 Unassigned, Judge; Location: South Courtroom 210; CANCELED: Cancelled

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • DocketPre-trial Cancelled Per AO 2020-33-CO; Pre-trial Cancelled Per AO 2020-33-CO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Tax Costs; Party: Plaintiff Plantation Open MRI LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketConfession of Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing; RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Party: Plaintiff Plantation Open MRI LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service on Ins Commissioner; Served; GEICO General Insurance Company

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet; Amount: $99.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance - Pretrial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim (eFiled)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogs; TO DEFENDANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogs; TO DEFENDANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Taking Deposition; Duces Tecum Of Df's Corporate Respresentative

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Compel; Df's Response To Pl's First Set Of Interrogatories And Supplemental Interrogatories

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Compel; DEPOSITION FOR DATE CERTAIN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Summary Judgment; Or Summary Disposition As To Whether Df Improperly Reduced Pl's Personal Injury PRotection Medical Bills

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Plantation Open MRI LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Storani, Sean A, ESQ.