This case was last updated from Broward County Courts on 02/26/2020 at 14:34:44 (UTC).

Pines Imaging Center LLC Plaintiff vs. Progressive Express Insurance Company Defendant

Case Summary

On 02/01/2018 Pines Imaging Center LLC Plaintiff filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Progressive Express Insurance Company Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Courts, West Regional Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Francois, Phoebee. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1681

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Broward County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Regional Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Francois, Phoebee

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Pines Imaging Center LLC

Pascal, Jean

Defendant

Progressive Express Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Dalal, Abdul-Sumi

Attorney at Johnson Dalal

111 N Pine Island Rd., Ste#103

Plantation, FL 33324

Defendant Attorney

Cole, Ashley L

Attorney at Progressive PIP House Counsel

3230 W Commercial Blvd, Suite 400

Ft Lauderdale, FL 33309

 

Court Documents

Objection

5/13/2019 - Objection

Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum

4/2/2019 - Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum

Notice of Filing

9/25/2018 - Notice of Filing

Privilege Log

9/21/2018 - Privilege Log

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

9/21/2018 - Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

9/21/2018 - Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Reply to Affirmative Defenses

8/23/2018 - Reply to Affirmative Defenses

Notice of Supplemental Interrogs

8/23/2018 - Notice of Supplemental Interrogs

Supplemental Request to Produce

8/23/2018 - Supplemental Request to Produce

Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement

8/20/2018 - Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement

Motion for Summary Judgment

8/17/2018 - Motion for Summary Judgment

Agreed Order

8/7/2018 - Agreed Order

Notice of Hearing

5/29/2018 - Notice of Hearing

Motion to Stay

4/19/2018 - Motion to Stay

Motion to Dismiss

4/9/2018 - Motion to Dismiss

Request to Produce

3/20/2018 - Request to Produce

Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

3/20/2018 - Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

Notice of Voluntary Dismissal W/Prejudice

8/22/2019 - Notice of Voluntary Dismissal W/Prejudice

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionNotice of Voluntary Dismissal W/Prejudice; Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; 1 Pages; Instrument Number: 116009727

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • DispositionDismissed, Settled or Disposed Before Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketObjection; TO NOTICE OF DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM; Party: Defendant Progressive Express Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request for Production

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request for Production

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPrivilege Log

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 03/23/2018
  • HearingPIP Pre-trial Hearing; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Judicial Officer(s): 81 Francois, Phoebee; Location: West Courtroom 240; CANCELED: Cancelled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInterrogatories & Notice of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Appearance; NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: ABDUL-SUMI DALAL ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A016132; Amount: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid; Payor: ABDUL-SUMI DALAL ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A016132; Amount: $175.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance - Pretrial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim (eFiled)

    Read MoreRead Less