This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 11/17/2020 at 18:53:35 (UTC).

PFG Loans Inc Inc Plaintiff vs. Rasim G Adak, et al Defendant

Case Summary

On 10/20/2016 PFG Loans Inc Inc Plaintiff filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Rasim G Adak, Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Gundersen, Andrea Ruth. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9326

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Gundersen, Andrea Ruth

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PFG Loans Inc Inc

Provident Funding Group

Defendants

PNC Bank NA

Adak, Rasim G

National City

Cypress Head Club Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Swartz, Sean Matthew

Defendant Attorneys

Yousuf, Mehwish A

Hemmerle, Kenneth V, II

 

Court Documents

Final Disposition Form

11/9/2017 - Final Disposition Form

Order Vacating Default

3/16/2017 - Order Vacating Default

Amended Answer & Affirmative Defenses

2/6/2017 - Amended Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Motion to Vacate Default

2/6/2017 - Motion to Vacate Default

Notice of Appearance

2/6/2017 - Notice of Appearance

Notice of Hearing

1/10/2017 - Notice of Hearing

Certificate of Service

12/15/2016 - Certificate of Service

Motion to Dismiss

12/15/2016 - Motion to Dismiss

Order Extending Time

12/6/2016 - Order Extending Time

Notice of Appearance

11/29/2016 - Notice of Appearance

Motion for Default

11/29/2016 - Motion for Default

Default

11/29/2016 - Default

Affidavit

11/29/2016 - Affidavit

Motion for Enlargement of Time

11/23/2016 - Motion for Enlargement of Time

Motion for Enlargement of Time

11/23/2016 - Motion for Enlargement of Time

Summons Returned Served

11/10/2016 - Summons Returned Served

Summons Returned Served

11/10/2016 - Summons Returned Served

Summons Returned Served

10/31/2016 - Summons Returned Served

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionVoluntary Dismissal; Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; 2 Pages; Instrument Number: 114712661

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • DispositionDismissed After Hearing - Other

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFinal Disposition Form

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Vacating Default

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmended Answer & Affirmative Defenses; DEFENDANT'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE TO VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR FORECLOSURE OF MORTGAGE; Party: Defendant PNC Bank NA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Vacate Default; Party: Defendant PNC Bank NA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Appearance; MEHWISH YOUSUF; Party: Defendant PNC Bank NA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Service; OF AGREED ORDER ON DEFENANT'S MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME; Party: Plaintiff PFG Loans Inc Inc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Dismiss; VERIFIED COMPLAINT; Party: Defendant Adak, Rasim G

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 10/21/2016
  • DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: JONATHAN IAN MEISELS ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20161FA1A147634; Amount: $10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketValue Claim Form

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Lis Pendens

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice; Certification of Possession

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint (eFiled); for Foreclosure of Mtg; Party: Plaintiff PFG Loans Inc Inc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; Cypress Head Club Inc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; PNC Bank NA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; Rasim G Adak

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; Unknown Spouse of Rasim G Adak

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less