This case was last updated from Broward County Courts on 02/26/2020 at 23:37:17 (UTC).

Pembroke Pines MRI Inc Plaintiff vs. USAA General Indemnity Company Defendant

Case Summary

On 02/16/2018 Pembroke Pines MRI Inc Plaintiff filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against USAA General Indemnity Company Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Courts, West Regional Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Francois, Phoebee. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2133

  • Filing Date:

    02/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Broward County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Regional Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Francois, Phoebee

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Pembroke Pines MRI Inc

Osgood, Moses

DPI of Pembroke Pines

Defendant

USAA General Indemnity Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Poulopoulos, Theophilos G

Attorney at Schiller, Kessler, & Gomez PLC

7501 West Oakland Park Blvd, Second Floor

Ft Lauderdale, FL 33319

Defendant Attorney

Rampersad, Ananta

Attorney at Roig Lawyers

2054 Vista Parkway, Suite 400

West Palm Beach, FL 33411

 

Court Documents

Notice of Filing

4/25/2018 - Notice of Filing

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

4/23/2018 - Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Privilege Log

4/10/2018 - Privilege Log

Notice of Service of Interrogs

4/9/2018 - Notice of Service of Interrogs

Motion

4/9/2018 - Motion

Request to Produce

4/9/2018 - Request to Produce

Response to Request for Admissions

4/9/2018 - Response to Request for Admissions

Motion to Dismiss

3/30/2018 - Motion to Dismiss

Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

3/29/2018 - Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

Demand for Jury Trial

3/26/2018 - Demand for Jury Trial

Motion to Invoke Rules of Civil Procedure

3/26/2018 - Motion to Invoke Rules of Civil Procedure

Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses

3/26/2018 - Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses

Notice of Appearance

3/26/2018 - Notice of Appearance

eSummons Issuance - Pretrial

2/16/2018 - eSummons Issuance - Pretrial

Notice of Service of Interrogs

2/16/2018 - Notice of Service of Interrogs

Request to Produce

2/16/2018 - Request to Produce

Request for Admissions

2/16/2018 - Request for Admissions

Notice of Voluntary Dismissal W/Out Prejudice

5/3/2018 - Notice of Voluntary Dismissal W/Out Prejudice

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionNotice of Voluntary Dismissal W/Out Prejudice; Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; 1 Pages; Instrument Number: 115053365

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • DispositionDismissed, Settled or Disposed Before Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing; Defendant' s Motion For Sanctions/ Attorney' s Fees; Party: Defendant USAA General Indemnity Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories; Party: Defendant USAA General Indemnity Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPrivilege Log; DEFENDANT'S PRIVILEGE LOG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request for Production; Party: Defendant USAA General Indemnity Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogs; Party: Defendant USAA General Indemnity Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion; TO PERMIT LATE FILING OF ANSWERS TO PL REQ FOR ADMISSIONS; Party: Defendant USAA General Indemnity Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce; Party: Defendant USAA General Indemnity Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request for Admissions; Party: Defendant USAA General Indemnity Company

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 03/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Invoke Rules of Civil Procedure; Party: Defendant USAA General Indemnity Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses; Party: Defendant USAA General Indemnity Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Appearance; Party: Defendant USAA General Indemnity Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2018
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid; Payor: THEOPHILOS GEORGE POULOPOULOS ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A025051; Amount: $175.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2018
  • DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: THEOPHILOS GEORGE POULOPOULOS ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A025051; Amount: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim (eFiled)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance - Pretrial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less