This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 05/29/2020 at 22:15:01 (UTC).

Pelican Pointe at the Villages Inc Plaintiff vs. Pelican Pointe Home Owners Association INC Defendant

Case Summary

On 08/30/2018 Pelican Pointe at the Villages Inc Plaintiff filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Pelican Pointe Home Owners Association INC Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Singer, Michele Towbin. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0727

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Courthouse:

    Broward County Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Singer, Michele Towbin

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Pelican Pointe at the Villages Inc

Defendant

Pelican Pointe Home Owners Association INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Strock, Barton Sheldon

Attorney at Strock & Cohen Zipper Law Group PA

12 Se 7Th St Ste 712

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301-3474

Defendant Attorney

Struble, Kari Hiers

Attorney at Strock & Cohen Zipper Law Group PA

12 Se 7Th Street, Suite 712

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

 

Court Documents

Affidavit in Support

11/7/2018 - Affidavit in Support

Notice of Hearing

11/6/2018 - Notice of Hearing

Motion for Summary Judgment

10/26/2018 - Motion for Summary Judgment

Summons Returned Served

10/15/2018 - Summons Returned Served

Notice of Service

10/12/2018 - Notice of Service

Affidavit of Service

10/11/2018 - Affidavit of Service

Motion for Default & Default

10/11/2018 - Motion for Default & Default

Civil Cover Sheet

8/30/2018 - Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint (eFiled)

8/30/2018 - Complaint (eFiled)

eSummons Issuance

8/30/2018 - eSummons Issuance

Final Summary Judgment

12/12/2018 - Final Summary Judgment

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionFinal Summary Judgment; Comment (Quieting Title and Reforming a Deed ); Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; 24 Pages; Instrument Number: 115518817

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • DispositionDisposed by Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit in Support

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Summary Judgment; Party: Plaintiff Pelican Pointe at the Villages Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Served; on the 19th day of September, 2018; Party: Defendant Pelican Pointe Home Owners Association INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Service; 9/19/18; Party: Defendant Pelican Pointe Home Owners Association INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Default & Default; Against; Party: Defendant Pelican Pointe Home Owners Association INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint (eFiled); for Quiet Title for Adverse Possessin and Reformatin of Deed; Party: Plaintiff Pelican Pointe at the Villages Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; PELICAN POINTE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid; Payor: STROCK COHEN, ZIPPER LAW GRO; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A118232; Amount: $401.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: STROCK COHEN, ZIPPER LAW GRO; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A118232; Amount: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Pelican Point at the Villages Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Struble Kari H