This case was last updated from Broward County Courts on 03/06/2020 at 00:57:54 (UTC).

Pelican Pointe At the Villages, Inc. Plaintiff vs. Christopher A. Hay, et al Defendant

Case Summary

On 08/01/2018 Pelican Pointe At the Villages, Inc Plaintiff filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Christopher A Hay, Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Courts, West Regional Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DePrimo, Natasha. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7852

  • Filing Date:

    08/01/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Courthouse:

    West Regional Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DePrimo, Natasha

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Pelican Pointe At the Villages, Inc.

Defendants

Unknown Spouse of Christopher A. Hay

Unknown Tenant Two

Hay, Christopher A.

Unkniown Tenant One

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Chadrow, Michael S, ESQ.

Attorney at Brough Chadrow & Levine, P.A.

2149 North Commerce Parkway

Weston, FL 33326-3238

 

Court Documents

Stipulation for-of Settlement

11/1/2018 - Stipulation for-of Settlement

Mediation Report

11/1/2018 - Mediation Report

Notice of Mediation

10/4/2018 - Notice of Mediation

Summons Returned Served

9/6/2018 - Summons Returned Served

Summons Returned Unserved

9/6/2018 - Summons Returned Unserved

Summons Returned Unserved

9/6/2018 - Summons Returned Unserved

Summons Returned Unserved

9/6/2018 - Summons Returned Unserved

Order Referring Case to Mediation

9/5/2018 - Order Referring Case to Mediation

Answer to Complaint

8/31/2018 - Answer to Complaint

eSummons Issuance

8/2/2018 - eSummons Issuance

eSummons Issuance

8/1/2018 - eSummons Issuance

eSummons Issuance

8/1/2018 - eSummons Issuance

eSummons Issuance

8/1/2018 - eSummons Issuance

Complaint (eFiled)

8/1/2018 - Complaint (eFiled)

Notice of Lis Pendens

8/1/2018 - Notice of Lis Pendens

Civil Cover Sheet

8/1/2018 - Civil Cover Sheet

Order Approving Settlement

11/5/2018 - Order Approving Settlement

Notice of Dropping Party(S)

10/23/2018 - Notice of Dropping Party(S)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionOrder Approving Settlement; Comment (Agreed )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • DispositionDisposed by Judge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation for-of Settlement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMediation Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionNotice of Dropping Party(S); Comment (Unknown Spouse of Christopher A. Hay, Unk Tenant One and Unk Tenant Two ); Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; 1 Pages; Instrument Number: 115400283

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Mediation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • DocketMediation Fee; Payor: CHRISTOPHER A HAY ; Userid: CTS-scallenius ; Receipt: 20181YF1B001070; Comments: DF ; Amount: $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Served; 8/14/18; Party: Defendant Hay, Christopher A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Unserved; Party: Defendant Unknown Spouse of Christopher A. Hay

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Unserved; Party: Defendant Unkniown Tenant One

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 08/02/2018
  • DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: BROUGH, CHADROW LEVINE, P.A.; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A104659; Amount: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: BROUGH, CHADROW LEVINE, P.A.; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A104659; Amount: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; Party: Defendant Unkniown Tenant One

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: BROUGH, CHADROW LEVINE, P.A.; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A105010; Amount: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; Party: Defendant Unknown Tenant Two

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; Party: Defendant Unknown Spouse of Christopher A. Hay

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; Party: Defendant Hay, Christopher A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint (eFiled)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Lis Pendens; Fld & Rec

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Pelican Point at the Villages Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Chadrow, Michael S