This case was last updated from Broward County Courts on 03/05/2020 at 15:33:22 (UTC).

PBH Deer Chase LLC Plaintiff vs. Heraldovan Inacio Damacena, et al Defendant

Case Summary

On 02/20/2019 PBH Deer Chase LLC Plaintiff filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against Heraldovan Inacio Damacena, Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Courts, North Regional Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Hurley, John. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3471

  • Filing Date:

    02/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • Courthouse:

    North Regional Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Hurley, John

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PBH Deer Chase LLC

Pavillions at Deer Chase Apartment Homes

Defendants

De Souza, Josiane Moreira

Damacena, Heraldovan Inacio

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

McCain, Ryan R

Attorney at Barfield, McCain, PA

4241 Northlake Blvd Ste B

Palm Beach Gardens, FL 33410

 

Court Documents

Writ of Possession Returned Served

5/3/2019 - Writ of Possession Returned Served

Order of Default

4/3/2019 - Order of Default

Motion for Default Final Judgment

3/28/2019 - Motion for Default Final Judgment

Order Requiring Rent Money Into Ct Reg

3/21/2019 - Order Requiring Rent Money Into Ct Reg

Motion to Enforce

3/15/2019 - Motion to Enforce

Notice of Hearing

3/14/2019 - Notice of Hearing

Motion to Strike

3/13/2019 - Motion to Strike

Judge's Review Notes on Tenant Evictions

3/11/2019 - Judge's Review Notes on Tenant Evictions

Answer to Tenant Eviction

3/5/2019 - Answer to Tenant Eviction

Certificate of Mailing

2/26/2019 - Certificate of Mailing

Summons Returned Served

2/26/2019 - Summons Returned Served

Summons Returned Served

2/26/2019 - Summons Returned Served

Civil Cover Sheet

2/20/2019 - Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint (eFiled)

2/20/2019 - Complaint (eFiled)

eSummons Issuance

2/20/2019 - eSummons Issuance

eSummons Issuance

2/20/2019 - eSummons Issuance

Final Judgment for Eviction

4/5/2019 - Final Judgment for Eviction

Default Judgment for Eviction

4/3/2019 - Default Judgment for Eviction

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Possession Returned Served; POSTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • DocketWrit of Possession Issued to BSO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionFinal Judgment for Eviction; Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; 1 Pages; Instrument Number: 115722225

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • DispositionDisposed by Judge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • DocketWrit of Possession Issued to BSO; ck#46755

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionDefault Judgment for Eviction; Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; 1 Pages; Instrument Number: 115719675

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder of Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Default; JUDICIAL; Party: Plaintiff PBH Deer Chase LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Default Final Judgment; FOR EVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Requiring Rent Money Into Ct Reg; Df To Post $ 2,987.21 By 3/25/19 12:01PM

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Served; POSTED 2/25/19; Party: Defendant Damacena, Heraldovan Inacio

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Served; POSTED 2/25/19; Party: Defendant De Souza, Josiane Moreira

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid; Payor: DAVID SETARO ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20191FA1A028126; Amount: $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: DAVID SETARO ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20191FA1A028126; Amount: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: DAVID SETARO ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20191FA1A028126; Amount: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint (eFiled)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; Party: Defendant Damacena, Heraldovan Inacio

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; Party: Defendant De Souza, Josiane Moreira

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer RYAN MCCAIN